Boyer v. Fikes
Petitioner: Willie J. Boyer
Respondent: Warden Fikes
Case Number: 0:2019cv02213
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 9/30/2019. (MSK) cc: Boyer on 10/1/2019 (KNK).
September 10, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus: scanned envelope back. (KMH)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad A Blumenfield on behalf of Warden Fikes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Blumenfield, Chad)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Willie J. Boyer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Memorandum, #3 MOTION to Expedite (CLK) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/10/2019 (KMH)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 EMERGENCY MOTION TO EXPEDITE HABEAS CORPUS PROCEEDINGS filed by Willie J. Boyer. (CLK) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/10/2019 (KMH)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Willie J. Boyer.(CLK) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/10/2019 (KMH)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing fee $5, receipt number 400104232) filed by Willie J. Boyer. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per Civil (5th - Prisoner) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Envelope) cc: Boyer. (CLK) Modified filing date on 8/13/2019 (CLK). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2019: #5 Scanned envelope back) (KMH). Document QC'd by KMH on 9/10/2019 (KMH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyer v. Fikes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Willie J. Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Fikes
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Chad A Blumenfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?