Mattson v. Standard Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Melissa Mattson
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2019cv02217
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Joan N Ericksen
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER/NOTICE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/7/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 11/14/2019 at 09:00 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 342 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TMA)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Standard Insurance Company. (Wagener, Terrance)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicolet Lyon on behalf of Melissa Mattson. (Lyon, Nicolet)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT that Defendant Standard Insurance Company is a wholly owned subsidiary of StanCorp Financial Group, Inc. (StanCorp). StanCorp is owned by Meiji Yasuda Life Insurance Company, a Japanese Mutual Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wagener, Terrance) Modified text on 8/15/2019 (kt).
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per 3rd/4th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-2217 JNE/ECW. (KDS)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey County District Court (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7075844) filed by Standard Insurance Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons & Complaint, #2 Notice of Removal (State), #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service) (Wagener, Terrance)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mattson v. Standard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Mattson
Represented By: Katherine L MacKinnon
Represented By: Nicolet Lyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Terrance J Wagener
Represented By: Christopher J Haugen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?