Carpenter et al v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jasmine Dennis and Dustin Carpenter
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and Equifax Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv02218
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 JPML ORDER LIFTING STAY ON CTO-46. (kt)
September 20, 2019 NOTICE: The case has been transferred/extracted to the Northern District of Georgia. (kt)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-46) transferring case to the Northern District of Georgia per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr.. (kt)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on #5 Stipulation as to all Defendants. Answer due on 9/18/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 8/20/2019. (TJB)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 Stipulation. (Haugen, Christopher)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Equifax Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC. Jointly Signed by Dustin Carpenter and Jasmine Dennis. (Haugen, Christopher)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Equifax Inc.. (Haugen, Christopher)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Equifax Inc. is a corporate parent of Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Haugen, Christopher)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-2218 (ECT/DTS). (MMP)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7075851) filed by Equifax Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Haugen, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpenter et al v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J Haugen
Represented By: Joseph W Lawver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J Haugen
Represented By: Joseph W Lawver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine Dennis
Represented By: David J S Madgett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Carpenter
Represented By: David J S Madgett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?