Veith v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Kara J. Veith
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 0:2019cv02242
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Becky R Thorson
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Wells Fargo & Company is a corporate parent of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Savran, Jessica)
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Webber, Charles)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER on #8 Stipulation. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answer due 9/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 9/6/2019. (MSK)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 Stipulation. (Webber, Charles)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Extension of Time for Wells Fargo to Respond to Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Jointly Signed by Kara J. Veith. (Webber, Charles)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Equifax is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Equifax Inc., which is a publicly traded company. (Running, Terri) Modified text on 9/5/2019 (MKB).
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Running, Terri)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kara J. Veith. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. (Lyons, Thomas)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kara J. Veith. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. (Lyons, Thomas)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (lmb)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 19-cv-2242 (JRT/BRT). (lmb) Modified text on 8/14/2019 (lmb).
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demanded against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7079377) filed by Kara J Veith. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lyons, Thomas) Modified text on 8/14/2019 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veith v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J Haugen
Represented By: Terri A Running
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jessica Z Savran
Represented By: Charles F Webber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kara J. Veith
Represented By: Thomas J Lyons, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?