Weinandt v. MTU America Inc.
Plaintiff: Amy Weinandt
Defendant: MTU America Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv02258
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #10 Order/Notice of Setting/Resetting Hearings/Deadlines, attached Consent Form. (MTP)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER/NOTICE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 10/31/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/31/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 11/7/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 9/25/2019. (TJB) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2019: #1 Consent Form) (MTP).
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint filed by MTU America Inc.. (Somermeyer, Sean)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on #6 Stipulation. MTU America Inc. answer due 9/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 9/9/2019. (TJB)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Stipulation. (Somermeyer, Sean)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by MTU America Inc.. Jointly Signed by Amy Weinandt. (Somermeyer, Sean)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean R Somermeyer on behalf of MTU America Inc.. (Somermeyer, Sean)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amy Weinandt. MTU America Inc. served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Kornblit, Michelle)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MTU America Inc. (MMP)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-2258 (SRN/DTS). (MMP)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MTU America Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7081251) filed by Amy Weinandt. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Smith, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weinandt v. MTU America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Weinandt
Represented By: Michelle L Kornblit
Represented By: Steven Andrew Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTU America Inc.
Represented By: Sara Lewenstein
Represented By: Sean R. Somermeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?