Sorensen v. Barnes
Petitioner: Laura Sorensen
Respondent: Warden Nanette Barnes
Case Number: 0:2019cv02268
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Steven E Rau
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE TO #3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION filed by Laura Sorensen. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope)(MMP)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Laura Sorensen filed by Laura Sorensen, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Laura Sorensen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/23/2019. (MME). cc: Sorensen. Modified text on 9/24/2019 (MTP).
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Laura Sorensen. (kt) Document QC'd by KMW on 9/10/19.
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Laura Sorensen. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kt)cc: Sorensen. (kt) Document QC'd by KMW on 9/10/19.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sorensen v. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Laura Sorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Nanette Barnes
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?