Apothecary Products LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Apothecary Products LLC
Defendant: John Doe, Shenzhenshi Haili Shangmao Youxia Gongsi and Haili
Case Number: 0:2019cv02279
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Steven E Rau
2 Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
3 Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting (9) Motion for an Order Permitting Limited Discovery Prior to the Rule 26(f) Conference in case 0:19-cv-02278-PJS-HB; granting (9) Motion for an Order Permitting Limited Discovery Prior to the Rule 26(f) Conference in case 0:19-cv-02279-PJS-HB; granting (9) Motion for an Order Permitting Limited Discovery Prior to the Rule 26(f) Conference in case 0:19-cv-02280-PJS-HB; granting (9) Motion for an Order Permitting Limited Discovery Prior to the Rule 26(f) Conference in case 0:19-cv-02281-PJS-HB; granting (9) Motion for an Order Permitting Limited Discovery Prior to the Rule 26(f) Conference in case 0:19-cv-02282-PJS-HB Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/24/2019. Associated Cases: 0:19-cv-02278-PJS-HB, 0:19-cv-02279-PJS-HB, 0:19-cv-02280-PJS-HB, 0:19-cv-02281-PJS-HB, 0:19-cv-02282-PJS-HB(JMK)
September 18, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
August 30, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 MOTION for Discovery AN ORDER PERMITTING LIMITED DISCOVERY PRIOR TO THE RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE filed by Apothecary Products LLC.(Schultz, William)
August 30, 2019 Filing 13 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #9 Motion for Discovery filed by Apothecary Products LLC.(Schultz, William)
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 Declaration of William Schultz in Support of #9 MOTION for Discovery AN ORDER PERMITTING LIMITED DISCOVERY PRIOR TO THE RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE filed by Apothecary Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E)(Schultz, William)
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION for Discovery AN ORDER PERMITTING LIMITED DISCOVERY PRIOR TO THE RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE filed by Apothecary Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Schultz, William)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #9 MOTION for Discovery AN ORDER PERMITTING LIMITED DISCOVERY PRIOR TO THE RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE : Date and time to be determined. (Schultz, William)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Discovery AN ORDER PERMITTING LIMITED DISCOVERY PRIOR TO THE RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE filed by Apothecary Products LLC. (Schultz, William)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order of Reassignment of Related Cases. This case is reassigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer for all further proceedings. Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright, Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-2279 (PJS/HB). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz, Judge Susan Richard Nelson, and Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 8/21/2019 and by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 8/22/2019.(MMP)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Apothecary Products LLC regarding related cases. (McDonald, Daniel)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel W McDonald on behalf of Apothecary Products LLC. (McDonald, Daniel)
August 16, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Apothecary Holdco, LLC, is the parent corporation of Apothecary Products LLC. (Schultz, William) Modified text on 8/19/2019 (lmb).
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Schultz, William)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to John Doe. (lmb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd, 4th - Patent) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 19-cv-2279 (WMW/SER). (lmb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-7087359) filed by Apothecary Products LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (Schultz, William) Modified text on 8/16/2019 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apothecary Products LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhenshi Haili Shangmao Youxia Gongsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haili
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apothecary Products LLC
Represented By: William D Schultz
Represented By: Rachel Zimmerman Scobie
Represented By: Michael A Erbele
Represented By: Ryan Borelo, I
Represented By: Daniel W McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?