Zippo Manufacturing Company v. Winters
Plaintiff: Zippo Manufacturing Company
Defendant: Bryan W. Winters
Case Number: 0:2019cv02286
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL by Zippo Manufacturing Company (Hibbard, Kathryn) Modified text on 9/25/2019 (MMG).
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Bryan W. Winters. (kt)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David S Elkins for Zippo Manufacturing Company; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Joseph P. Grasser for Zippo Manufacturing Company. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 8/23/2019. (NAH)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph P. Grasser. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7096113 filed by Zippo Manufacturing Company. (Hibbard, Kathryn)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David S. Elkins. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7095085 filed by Zippo Manufacturing Company. (Hibbard, Kathryn)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Hibbard, Kathryn)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing David S. Elkins as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (kt)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Zippo Manufacturing Company. (Hibbard, Kathryn)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Copyright/Trademark list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-2286 ECT/DTS. (kt)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bryan W. Winters (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7088161) filed by Zippo Manufacturing Company. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hibbard, Kathryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zippo Manufacturing Company v. Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan W. Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zippo Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Kathryn N. Hibbard
Represented By: Joseph P. Grasser
Represented By: David S Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?