Gruenwald v. Toro Company, The et al
Plaintiff: Scott Gruenwald
Defendant: The Toro Company, Toro International, Inc. and Toro Compny, The
Case Number: 0:2019cv02294
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 20 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, to Strike the Class Allegations, and for Partial Summary Judgment #16 Motion to Dismiss/General, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Fisher, Heidi)
October 7, 2019 Filing 19 Declaration of John Hurst in Support of #16 MOTION to Dismiss/General the Complaint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Motion to Strike the Class Allegations filed by Toro Compny, The, Toro International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Fisher, Heidi)
October 7, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 MOTION to Dismiss/General the Complaint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Motion to Strike the Class Allegations filed by Toro Compny, The, Toro International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Fisher, Heidi)
October 7, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #16 MOTION to Dismiss/General the Complaint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Motion to Strike the Class Allegations : Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7D (STP) before Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (Fisher, Heidi)
October 7, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss/General the Complaint, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Motion to Strike the Class Allegations filed by Toro Compny, The, Toro International, Inc.. (Fisher, Heidi)
September 11, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7D (STP) before Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (Fisher, Heidi)
September 11, 2019 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendants Toro Compny, The, Toro International, Inc.. (Fisher, Heidi)
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED ORDER: In re dispositive motion practice in cases assigned to Judge Magnuson, signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on October 1, 2014.(JEP)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES that 19-cv-2345 NEB/ECW has been reassigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson and Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 8/27/2019 and Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 8/28/19. (CLK)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kenneth A Wexler for Scott Gruenwald. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 8/21/2019. (NAH)
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kenneth A. Wexler. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7096185 filed by Scott Gruenwald. (Williams, Amanda)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Gruenwald. Toro Compny, The served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019; Toro International, Inc. served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019. (Williams, Amanda)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Mark Tamblyn for Scott Gruenwald. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 8/21/2019. (NAH)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark J. Tamblyn. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7094205 filed by Scott Gruenwald. (Williams, Amanda)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James Joseph Pepper for Scott Gruenwald. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 8/20/2019. (NAH)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James J. Pepper. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7093318 filed by Scott Gruenwald. (Williams, Amanda)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Kenneth A. Wexler, Mark J. Tamblyn, James Pepper as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MMP)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Toro Compny, The, Toro International, Inc. (MMP)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 19-cv-2294 (PAM/BRT). (MMP)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Toro Company, The, Toro International, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7090961) filed by Scott Gruenwald. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Williams, Amanda) Modified text on 8/20/2019 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gruenwald v. Toro Company, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Gruenwald
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Kenneth A Wexler
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Mark Tamblyn
Represented By: James Joseph Pepper
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Toro Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toro International, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew S Hansen
Represented By: Randall J Pattee
Represented By: Heidi A O Fisher
Represented By: Ellie J Barragry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toro Compny, The
Represented By: Andrew S Hansen
Represented By: Randall J Pattee
Represented By: Heidi A O Fisher
Represented By: Ellie J Barragry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?