Jackson et al v. Lycos et al
Plaintiff: Dana Jackson and Jackson Americas Srvcs, LLC
Defendant: Jessica Schultz, Shadi Jallad, Marilyn Liszka, Cindy Lycos, Citibank of Vernon Hill and Citibank 1 Oak St Chicago
Case Number: 0:2019cv02325
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Joan N Ericksen
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Dana Jackson. (CLK)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER to the Court from Dana Jackson.(CLK) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/17/2019 (KMH).
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 EXHIBITS filed by Dana Jackson. (CLK) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/7/2019 (KMH).
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Dana Jackson (CLK) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/23/2019 (KMH).
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO REQUEST SERVICE ON DEFENDANTS filed by Dana Jackson. (CLK) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/26/2019 (KMH).
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs.; denying #3 Motion for TRO; denying #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction(Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 8/28/2019. cc: Jackson (CLK) Modified text on 8/29/2019 (CLK).
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR INJUNCTION RELIEF AND RESTRAINING ORDER UPON THE DEFENDANTS IN THE FOLLOWING CASES filed by Dana Jackson. (MMP)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Dana Jackson. (MMP) Document QC'd on 9/11/2019 by KMW.
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shadi Jallad, Marilyn Liszka, Cindy Lycos, Jessica Schultz, Citibank of Vernon Hill, Citibank 1 Oak St Chicago, filed by Dana Jackson, Jackson Americas Srvcs, LLC. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per Housing/Accomodations/ADA Other list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) cc: Jackson (MMP) modified text/Added Defts on 8/28/2019 (lmb). Document QC'd on 9/11/2019 by KMW.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. Lycos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shadi Jallad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Liszka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Lycos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank of Vernon Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank 1 Oak St Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson Americas Srvcs, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?