Jackson v. Lake County Court Judge Rosenburg et al
Plaintiff: Dana Jackson
Defendant: Vernon Hills Police Dept. and Lake County Court Judge Rosenburg
Case Number: 0:2019cv02329
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Steven E Rau
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Change of Address by Dana Jackson (MMG)
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Dana Jackson. (kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/17/2019 (KMH).
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 EXHIBITS filed by Dana Jackson.(MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/7/2019 (KMH).
September 24, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #6 Exhibit: scanned in backside of p. 71 of exhibits (KMH)
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address by Dana Jackson (MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/7/2019 (KMH).
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Dana Jackson. (MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/23/2019 (KMH).
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE/Correct Spelling of Defendants Name by Dana Jackson (MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/23/2019 (KMH).
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Dana Jackson. (MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/26/2019 (KMH).
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to request service on all defendants filed by Dana Jackson. (MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/26/2019 (KMH).
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #4 Motion for TRO, Motion for Preliminary Injunction; striking #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 9/3/2019. (CLG) cc: Dana Jackson with Application for IFP. Modified text on 9/3/2019 (MMP). Modified text on 9/3/2019 (MMP).
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 EXHIBITS filed by Dana Jackson.(MMG) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2019: #1 Scanned backside of p. 71 of exhibits (Certificate of Assets) (KMH). Document QC'd by KMH on 9/24/2019 (KMH).
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR/WILL REFILE. EXHIBIT filed by Dana Jackson.(MMG) Modified text on 9/3/2019 (MMG).
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Dana Jackson. (MMG)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Injunction Relief and Restraining Order(KDS)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 STRICKEN PER #7 ORDER DATED 9/3/2019 - Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Dana Jackson. (KDS) Modified text on 9/3/2019 (MMP). Document QC'd on 9/11/2019 by KMW.
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lake County Court Judge Rosenburg, Vernon Hills Police Dept. filed by Dana Jackson. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd/4th Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations, ADA Other list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KDS) Modified text on 8/23/2019 (KDS). Document QC'd on 9/11/2019 by KMW.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Lake County Court Judge Rosenburg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernon Hills Police Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake County Court Judge Rosenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?