Octaform Systems, Inc. v. Romsdahl et al
Plaintiff: Octaform Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Brandon Romsdahl, Romsdahl Companies, Inc., H-PAC Plastics, LLC, Bruce Johnston and EZ PVC LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv02335
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 9/20/2019. (JEP)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Octaform Systems, Inc. (Leventhal, Seth)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on #7 Stipulation to Allow Extension to Answer. Brandon Romsdahl answer due 10/15/2019; Romsdahl Companies, Inc. answer due 10/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 9/11/2019. (KAT)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 Stipulation,. (Tomsche, Michael)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION to allow extension of time to answer or respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Brandon Romsdahl, Romsdahl Companies, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Octaform Systems, Inc., Romsdahl Companies, Inc., and Brandon Romsdahl. (Tomsche, Michael)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Tomsche on behalf of Brandon Romsdahl, Romsdahl Companies, Inc.. (Tomsche, Michael)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to EZ PVC LLC, H-PAC Plastics, LLC, Bruce Johnston, Brandon Romsdahl, Romsdahl Companies, Inc. (MMP)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 19-cv-2335 (PAM/KMM). (MMP)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Plaintiff Octaform Systems, Inc. is owned by CFS Concrete Forming Systems Inc. and Countryman Investments Ltd. No publicly held corporation owns more than 10% of Plaintiffs stock. (Leventhal, Seth) Modified text on 8/28/2019 (KDS).
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7101992) filed by Octaform Systems, Inc. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Leventhal, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Octaform Systems, Inc. v. Romsdahl et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Romsdahl
Represented By: Michael J Tomsche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romsdahl Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J Tomsche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H-PAC Plastics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EZ PVC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Octaform Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly K Pierce
Represented By: Seth J S Leventhal
Represented By: Kelly K. Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?