Jackson v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Dana D Jackson
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv02349
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Joan N Ericksen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(MMP)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re Report and Recommendation [ECF No. #6 ]. Plaintiff Dana D. Jackson's Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. #3 ] is GRANTED and this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 10/23/2019. (CBC)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Dana D Jackson (MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/23/2019 (KMH).
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint, filed by Dana D Jackson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 9/18/2019. (JLB) cc: Dana D Jackson. Modified text on 9/19/2019 (MMP).
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING Plaintiff's #3 MOTION to Dismiss/General to Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 9/16/2019. (CBC) cc: Dana D Jackson. Modified text on 9/16/2019 (lmb).
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Dana D Jackson (MMG)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Jackson v. Apple Inc. filed by Dana D Jackson. (MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/18/2019 (KMH).
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Dana D Jackson. (JGK) Document Qc'd 9/12/19 by KMW.
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. filed by Dana D Jackson. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JGK) cc: Jackson. Document Qc'd 9/12/19 by KMW.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana D Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?