Jackson v. Grand Canyon University Academic Standards et al
Plaintiff: Dana D Jackson
Defendant: Christal Abron and Grand Canyon University Academic Standards
Case Number: 0:2019cv02350
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Steven E Rau
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss GCU Claim filed by Dana D Jackson. (MKB) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/23/2019 (KMH).
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Dana D Jackson. (MKB) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/23/2019 (KMH).
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 EXHIBIT filed by Dana D Jackson.(MKB) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/7/2019 (KMH).
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Summons filed by Dana D Jackson. (MKB) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/25/2019 (KMH).
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address by Dana D Jackson (MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/23/2019 (KMH).
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Dana D Jackson. (JGK) Modified text on 8/27/2019 (JGK). Document QC'd by KMH on 9/10/2019 (KMH).
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christal Abron, Grand Canyon University Academic Standards filed by Dana D Jackson. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Civil Rights/Housings Accom/ADA Other list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JGK) cc: Jackson. Modified text on 8/27/2019 (JGK). Document QC'd by KMH on 9/10/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Grand Canyon University Academic Standards et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christal Abron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Canyon University Academic Standards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana D Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?