United States Steel Corporation v. Glacier Park Iron Ore Properties, LLC
Plaintiff: United States Steel Corporation
Defendant: Glacier Park Iron Ore Properties, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv02354
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 15 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(MKB)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 9/11/2019. (SMD)
September 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by United States Steel Corporation (Ellison, Benjamin)
September 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by United States Steel Corporation Stipulation of the Parties (Ellison, Benjamin)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Seal #1 Complaint. (Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 8/28/2019. (JGS)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Leon DeJulius, Jr, for United States Steel Corporation; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Andy Stanton for United States Steel Corporation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 8/28/2019. (NAH)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Glacier Park Iron Ore Properties, LLC. (MMP)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 19-cv-2354 (SRN/BRT). (MMP)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew R. Stanton. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7105996 filed by United States Steel Corporation. (Ellison, Benjamin)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Leon F. DeJulius, Jr.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7105987 filed by United States Steel Corporation. (Ellison, Benjamin)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff United States Steel Corporation. (Ellison, Benjamin)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION to SEAL #1 Complaint, filed by United States Steel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Ellison, Benjamin)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to SEAL #1 Complaint, filed by United States Steel Corporation. (Ellison, Benjamin)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #1 Sealed Document(s) - #1 Sealed Complaint . (Ellison, Benjamin)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 SEALED COMPLAINT against Glacier Park Iron Ore Properties, LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7105917) filed by United States Steel Corporation. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Luger, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Steel Corporation v. Glacier Park Iron Ore Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Steel Corporation
Represented By: Benjamin L. Ellison
Represented By: Andrew M. Luger
Represented By: Andy Stanton
Represented By: Leon DeJulius, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glacier Park Iron Ore Properties, LLC
Represented By: James A Borland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?