Welch v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Ronald Welch
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 0:2019cv02364
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE: The case has been transferred/extracted to the Northern District of California. (lmb)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-150) transferring case to the Northern District of California per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to The Honorable Vince Chhabria. (lmb)
September 9, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (kt)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company. filed by Ronald Welch. Filer requests summons issued. (Johnson, Charles)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (MMP)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-2364 (WMW/TNL). (MMP)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7108224) filed by Ronald Welch. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Johnson, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Welch v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Welch
Represented By: Charles H Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?