Jackson v. Hennepin Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Dana Jackson
Defendant: Kelley Marks, Hennepin Hospital and Hennepin County Medical Center
Case Number: 0:2019cv02392
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
2 Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Judge John R. Tunheim recused. Case reassigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-2392 PJS/ECW. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 10/4/2019. (KDS) cc: Jackson. (kt)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER Asking Time Span On Order to Carry out the Summons from Dana Jackson. (KDS) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/17/2019 (KMH).
September 24, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #1 Complaint: Rescanned exhibits. (KMH)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Dana Jackson. (KDS) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/23/2019 (KMH).
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION Requesting Service Upon Defendants filed by Dana Jackson. (MMP) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/23/2019 (KMH).
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Dana Jackson. (JGK) Modified text on 8/31/2019 (JGK). Document QC'd by KMH on 9/24/2019 (KMH).
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hennepin Hospital, Kelley Marks, Hennepin County Medical Center filed by Dana Jackson. No summons requested. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations, ADA Other list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (JGK) cc: Jackson. Modified text on 9/3/2019 (MKB). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2019: #3 Rescanned exhibits) (KMH). Document QC'd by KMH on 9/24/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Hennepin Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelley Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hennepin Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hennepin County Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?