In the Matter of the Trust established under the Pooling and Servicing Agreement relating to the Wachovia Bank Commercial Mortgage Trust Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-C30
Defendant: Torchlight Debt Opportunity Fund II, LLC and Torchlight Value Fund, LLC
Petitioner: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Master Servicer
Respondent: C-III Asset Management LLC, CWCapital Asset Management LLC and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Paying Agent
In Re: In the Matter of the Trust established under the Pooling and Servicing Agreement relating to the Wachovia Bank Commercial Mortgage Trust Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-C30
Other: Azteca Partners LLC and Palomino Master Ltd.
Trustee: U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 0:2019cv02416
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
2 Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
3 Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 56 SERVICE by Publication filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Last publication date 10/28/2019. (Vehrs, Karla)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #54 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Nathan T. Shapiro for U.S. Bank National Association. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 10/28/2019. (NAH)
October 24, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nathan T. Shapiro. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7228700 filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (McCarthy, Michael)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER/NOTICE: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 10/21/2019. (MSK)
October 21, 2019 Filing 51 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Pretrial Conference and Scheduling Order #48 Order/Notice of Setting/Resetting Hearings/Deadlines. (Wassweiler, William)
October 18, 2019 Filing 53 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Status Conference held on 10/18/2019. (MSK)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #49 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Konstantina Calabro for CWCapital Asset Management LLC. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 10/17/2019. (NAH)
October 15, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Konstantina A. Calabro. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7208840 filed by CWCapital Asset Management LLC. (Crosby, David)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 10/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK)
October 8, 2019 Filing 47 (Text Entry Only) NOTICE re #45 Letter. The Court is in receipt of the parties' letter to the Court with proposed recommendations (Doc. No. 45). The Court has received a request to supplement the letter. Counsel for the parties must meet and confer and provide one joint supplemental letter to the Court. Approved by Magistrate Judge Thorson. (MSK)
October 8, 2019 Filing 46 (Text-Only) NOTICE: Telephone Conference set for 10/18/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Counsel has been provided call-in instructions. (MSK)
October 4, 2019 Filing 45 REPORT re 31 Order/Notice to Attorney, by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Master Servicer. (Vehrs, Karla)
September 26, 2019 Filing 44 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Interested Party DW Partners, LP. (Schroeder, Mark)
September 26, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark G Schroeder on behalf of DW Partners, LP. (Schroeder, Mark)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #39 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Gregory A. Cross for CWCapital Asset Management LLC; granting #40 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Colleen M. Mallon for CWCapital Asset Management LLC. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 9/26/2019. (NAH)
September 26, 2019 Filing 41 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendants Torchlight Debt Opportunity Fund II, LLC, Torchlight Value Fund, LLC. (Awsumb, Shannon)
September 26, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Colleen Mallon Casse. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7170250 filed by CWCapital Asset Management LLC. (Crosby, David)
September 26, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gregory A. Cross. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7170100 filed by CWCapital Asset Management LLC. (Crosby, David)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #35 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Elinor Murarova for C-III Asset Management LLC. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 9/25/2019. (NAH)
September 25, 2019 Filing 37 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. DWCapital Asset Management LLC is a wholly-owned subsidiary of CW Financial Services LLC. (Crosby, David) Modified text on 9/27/2019 (lmb).
September 25, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by David R Crosby on behalf of CWCapital Asset Management LLC. (Crosby, David)
September 25, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Elinor H. Murarova. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7167901 filed by C-III Asset Management LLC. (Sherman, Eric)
September 25, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric R Sherman on behalf of C-III Asset Management LLC. (Sherman, Eric)
September 25, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Andrew Blodger on behalf of C-III Asset Management LLC. (Blodger, Ian)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #28 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney John P Doherty for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Master Servicer; granting #30 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christopher A. Riley for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Paying Agent. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 9/25/2019. (NAH)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Counsel must meet and confer, and submit a recommendation to the Court in writing regarding timing for preparation of a proposed schedule and for the holding of a Rule 16 conference. The submission to the Court should be made on or before October 4, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 9/23/2019. (DMM)
September 20, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher A. Riley. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7160646 filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Paying Agent. (Vehrs, Karla)
September 20, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Karla M Vehrs on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Paying Agent. (Vehrs, Karla)
September 20, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John P. Doherty. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7159952 filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Master Servicer. (Vehrs, Karla)
September 20, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Karla M Vehrs on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Master Servicer. (Vehrs, Karla)
September 13, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooke D Anthony on behalf of Torchlight Debt Opportunity Fund II, LLC, Torchlight Value Fund, LLC. (Anthony, Brooke)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Maya Ginsburg for Palomino Master Ltd. and Azteca Partners LLC; granting #19 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael J. Hampson for Palomino Master Ltd. and Azteca Partners LLC; granting #20 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lawrence M. Rolnick for Palomino Master Ltd. and Azteca Partners LLC; granting #24 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Thomas Edward Redburn, Jr for Palomino Master Ltd. and Azteca Partners LLC. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 9/12/2019. (NAH)
September 12, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7142074 filed by Palomino Master Ltd. and Azteca Partners LLC. (Abramson, Norman)
September 12, 2019 Filing 23 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Palomino Fund Ltd. is the parent corporation of Palomino Master Ltd. Azteca Partners LLC has no parent corporations. (Abramson, Norman) Modified text on 9/16/2019 (CLK).
September 12, 2019 Filing 22 FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7141280 filed by Palomino Master Ltd. and Azteca Partners LLC. (Abramson, Norman) Modified text on 9/12/2019 (NAH).
September 12, 2019 Filing 21 FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael J. Hampson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7141270 filed by Palomino Master Ltd. and Azteca Partners LLC. (Abramson, Norman) Modified text on 9/12/2019 (NAH).
September 12, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lawrence M. Rolnick. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7141262 filed by Palomino Master Ltd. and Azteca Partners LLC. (Abramson, Norman)
September 12, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael J. Hampson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7141222 filed by Palomino Master Ltd. and Azteca Partners LLC. (Abramson, Norman)
September 12, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Maya Ginsburg. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7141149 filed by Palomino Master Ltd. and Azteca Partners LLC. (Abramson, Norman)
September 12, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Norman M Abramson on behalf of Palomino Master Ltd. and Azteca Partners LLC. (Abramson, Norman)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kevin J. Biron for U.S. Bank National Association. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 9/9/2019. (NAH)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. This case is reassigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson, Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-2416 PJS/BRT. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 9/6/2019. (KDS)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jonathan Edward Pickhardt for CWCapital Cobalt Vr. Ltd. and for Systed, LLC; granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Blair Alexander Adams for CWCapital Cobalt Vr. Ltd. and for Systed, LLC; granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Evan Michael Hess for CWCapital Cobalt Vr. Ltd. and for Systed, LLC. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 9/6/2019. (NAH)
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kevin Biron. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7128257 filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (McCarthy, Michael)
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Evan Hess. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7123939 filed by CWCapital Cobalt Vr. Ltd., Systed, LLC. (Orenstein, John)
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Blair A. Adams. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7123922 filed by CWCapital Cobalt Vr. Ltd., Systed, LLC. (Orenstein, John)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jonathan E. Pickhardt. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7123892 filed by CWCapital Cobalt Vr. Ltd., Systed, LLC. (Orenstein, John)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Interested Party Systed, LLC. (Orenstein, John)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Interested Party CWCapital Cobalt Vr. Ltd.. (Orenstein, John)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. U.S. Bancorp is a corporate parent of Trustee U.S. Bank National Association. (McCarthy, Michael)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ana Chilingarishvili on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association. (Chilingarishvili, Ana)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C McCarthy on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association. (McCarthy, Michael)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 EXHIBIT Notice of Removal (Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Orenstein, John)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 19-cv-2416 PAM/KMM. (kt)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing John P. Doherty, Jonathan E. Pickhardt, Blair A. Adams, Evan Hess as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (kt)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey County District Court, case number 62-TR-CV-19-33 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7120273) filed by Systed, LLC, CWCapital Cobalt Vr. Ltd.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A (Petition), #2 Exhibit(s) B (Exs to Petition), #3 Exhibit(s) C (Certificate of Rep), #4 Exhibit(s) D (Proposed Order), #5 Exhibit(s) E (State Court Docket), #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Orenstein, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the Matter of the Trust established under the Pooling and Servicing Agreement relating to the Wachovia Bank Commercial Mortgage Trust Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-C30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: William P Wassweiler
Represented By: Karla M Vehrs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Master Servicer
Represented By: Karla M Vehrs
Represented By: John P Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: In the Matter of the Trust established under the Pooling and Servicing Agreement relating to the Wachovia Bank Commercial Mortgage Trust Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-C30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Azteca Partners LLC
Represented By: Maya Ginsburg
Represented By: Norman M Abramson
Represented By: Michael J. Hampson
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Represented By: Thomas Edward Redburn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Palomino Master Ltd.
Represented By: Maya Ginsburg
Represented By: Norman M Abramson
Represented By: Michael J. Hampson
Represented By: Jessica L. Kometz
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Represented By: Thomas Edward Redburn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: C-III Asset Management LLC
Represented By: Eric R Sherman
Represented By: Elinor Murarova
Represented By: Ian Andrew Blodger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CWCapital Asset Management LLC
Represented By: Konstantina Calabro
Represented By: Colleen M. Mallon
Represented By: Thomas F Nelson
Represented By: David R Crosby
Represented By: Gregory A. Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Paying Agent
Represented By: William P Wassweiler
Represented By: Karla M Vehrs
Represented By: Christopher A. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torchlight Debt Opportunity Fund II, LLC
Represented By: Brooke D Anthony
Represented By: Shannon M Awsumb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torchlight Value Fund, LLC
Represented By: Brooke D Anthony
Represented By: Shannon M Awsumb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Nathan T. Shapiro
Represented By: Kevin J. Biron
Represented By: Michael C McCarthy
Represented By: Ana Chilingarishvili
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?