Brown v. Bosch et al
Plaintiff: Donovan Brown
Defendant: County of Washington, Paul Schnell and Guy Bosch
Case Number: 0:2019cv02426
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 EXHIBIT re: #12 filed by Donovan Brown.(MTP)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Donovan Brown. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(MTP)
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Donovan Brown. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MTP) Document QC'd on 10/28/2019 (NAH).
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Donovan Brown. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MTP) Document QC'd by KMW on 10/22/19
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 EXHIBIT : Letter to Paul Schnell, Commissioner of Corrections filed by Donovan Brown.(MTP) Document QC'd by KMW on 10/23/19.
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 EXHIBIT : Complaint sent to St. Paul Police Department filed by Donovan Brown.(MTP) Document QC'd by KMW on 10/23/19.
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 EXHIBIT: Complaint sent to Regions Hospital filed by Donovan Brown.(MTP) Document QC'd by KMW on 10/23/19.
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Donovan Brown. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MTP) Document QC'd by KMW on 10/23/19.
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 9/25/2019. (MSK) Modified text on 9/26/2019 (ACH). cc: Donovan Brown w/IFP
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Donovan Dejuan Brown by Donovan Brown. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(MTP)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Donovan Brown (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(MKB) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/8/2019 (KMH).
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Donovan Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(JGK) Modified text on 9/5/2019 (JGK). Document QC'd on 9/18/2019 (JGK).
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Guy Bosch, Paul Schnell, County of Washington, State of Minnesota filed by Donovan Brown. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (JGK) cc: Brown. Modified text on 9/5/2019 (JGK). Document QC'd on 9/18/2019 (JGK). Modified text on 9/20/2019 (MTP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Bosch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Schnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy Bosch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donovan Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?