United States of America v. $486,256 In U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $486,256 In U.S. Currency
Case Number: 0:2019cv02450
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:841
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by $486,256 In U.S. Currency of Claim (Conard, John)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 First ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by $486,256 In U.S. Currency. (Conard, John)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matin Emouna. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7251736 filed by $486,256 In U.S. Currency. (Conard, John)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Publication by United States of America . (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(Baune, Craig)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against $486,256 In U.S. Currency. filed by United States of America. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Baune, Craig)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 WARRANT Returned Executed as to $486,256 In U.S. Currency. (MKB) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/7/2019 (KMH).
September 12, 2019 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM issued. (kt)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Sixth Division Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-2450 PJS/LIB. (kt)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture in Rem against $486,256 In U.S. Currency filed by United States of America. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Baune, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $486,256 In U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $486,256 In U.S. Currency
Represented By: John C Conard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Craig R Baune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?