Fond Du Lac Band of Lake Superior Chippewa v. Stepp et al
Plaintiff: Fond du Lac Band of Lake Superior Chippewa
Defendant: Andrew Wheeler, Cathy Stepp, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, United States Environmental Protection Agency, Samuel L. Calkins and Ryan D. McCarthy
Case Number: 0:2019cv02489
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of U.S. Government Attorney Benjamin Grillot for Samuel L. Calkins, Ryan D. McCarthy, Cathy Stepp, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, United States Environmental Protection Agency, and for Andrew Wheeler. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 11/6/2019. (NAH)
November 6, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for U.S. Government Attorney Benjamin Grillot. (NAH)
October 8, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fond du Lac Band of Lake Superior Chippewa. U.S. Army Corps of Engineers served on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Ray-Hodge, Vanessa)
October 8, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fond du Lac Band of Lake Superior Chippewa. Ryan D. McCarthy served on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Ray-Hodge, Vanessa)
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fond du Lac Band of Lake Superior Chippewa. Samuel L. Calkins served on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Ray-Hodge, Vanessa)
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fond du Lac Band of Lake Superior Chippewa. United States Environmental Protection Agency served on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Ray-Hodge, Vanessa)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fond du Lac Band of Lake Superior Chippewa. Andrew Wheeler served on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Ray-Hodge, Vanessa)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fond du Lac Band of Lake Superior Chippewa. Cathy Stepp served on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Ray-Hodge, Vanessa)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Vanessa Ray-Hodge for Fond du Lac Band of Lake Superior Chippewa. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 9/13/2019. (NAH)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Vanessa L. Ray-Hodge. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7142846 filed by Fond du Lac Band of Lake Superior Chippewa. (Copeland, Sean)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Matthew L Murdock for Fond du Lac Band of Lake Superior Chippewa. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 9/12/2019. (NAH)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew L. Murdock. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7137485 filed by Fond du Lac Band of Lake Superior Chippewa. (Copeland, Sean)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Vanessa L. Ray-Hodge, Matthew L. Murdock as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MKB)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Samuel L. Calkins, Ryan D. McCarthy, Cathy Stepp, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, United States Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew Wheeler. (MKB)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (5th - Civil Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-2489 (PJS/LIB). (MKB)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Samuel L. Calkins, Ryan D. McCarthy, Cathy Stepp, United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew Wheeler (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7135452) filed by Fond Du Lac Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (Copeland, Sean) Modified text on 9/10/2019 (MKB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fond Du Lac Band of Lake Superior Chippewa v. Stepp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Wheeler
Represented By: Benjamin Grillot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Stepp
Represented By: Benjamin Grillot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: Benjamin Grillot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Benjamin Grillot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel L. Calkins
Represented By: Benjamin Grillot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan D. McCarthy
Represented By: Benjamin Grillot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fond du Lac Band of Lake Superior Chippewa
Represented By: Sean W Copeland
Represented By: Matthew L Murdock
Represented By: Vanessa Ray-Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?