Hudson v. Field's LawFirm/Attorney Kristen Gyolai et al
Plaintiff: Eddie Hudson, III
Defendant: Field's LawFirm/Attorney Kristen Gyolai, Trillium Staffing, XL Insurance w/c by Corvel Corporation and Brown & Carlson
Case Number: 0:2019cv02492
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER REFERRING Litigant to FBA Pro Se Project from Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz.(TJB)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 11/6/2019. (TJB)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7D (STP) before Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (Roff, Elizabeth)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED ORDER: In re dispositive motion practice in cases assigned to Judge Magnuson, signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on October 1, 2014. (JEP)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Service re: #3 Notice of Appearance by Elizabeth J Roff on behalf of Brown & Carlson. (Roff, Elizabeth) Modified text on 9/23/2019 (MKB).
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth J Roff on behalf of Brown & Carlson. (Roff, Elizabeth)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Eddie Hudson, III. (JGK) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/23/2019 (KMH).
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brown & Carlson, Field's LawFirm/Attorney Kristen Gyolai, Trillium Staffing, XL Insurance w/c by Corvel Corporation filed by Eddie Hudson, III. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Attachments: #1 DOCUMENT RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS PER JUDGE SCHULTZ'S CHAMBERS. Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (JGK) cc: Hudson. Modified text on 9/12/2019 (kt). Document QC'd by KMH on 9/23/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudson v. Field's LawFirm/Attorney Kristen Gyolai et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field's LawFirm/Attorney Kristen Gyolai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trillium Staffing
Represented By: Elizabeth J Roff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XL Insurance w/c by Corvel Corporation
Represented By: Elizabeth J Roff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown & Carlson
Represented By: Elizabeth J Roff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Hudson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?