Friends of the Boundary Waters Wilderness et al v. U.S. Army Corps of Engineers et al
Plaintiff: Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Center for Biological Diversity and Friends of the Boundary Waters Wilderness
Defendant: Ryan D. McCarthy and U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Case Number: 0:2019cv02493
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Friends of the Boundary Waters Wilderness, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Center for Biological Diversity. Ryan D. McCarthy served on 10/21/2019, answer due 12/20/2019; U.S. Army Corps of Engineers served on 10/21/2019, answer due 12/20/2019. (Parekh, Jaimini)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Permission for Non-Resident Attorney to Serve as Local Counsel and Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jaimini Parekh for Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Boundary Waters Wilderness, and for Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 9/19/2019. (NAH)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jaimini Parekh. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7154838 filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Boundary Waters Wilderness, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel)(Brimmer, Janette)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jaimini Parekh. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7148063 filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Boundary Waters Wilderness, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel)(Brimmer, Janette) Modified text on 9/17/2019 (NAH).
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Jaimini Parekh as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (CLK)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ryan D. McCarthy, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers. (CLK)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (5th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-2493 PJS/LIB. (CLK)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Boundary Waters Wilderness, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy. (Brimmer, Janette)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief and Injunctive Relief against Ryan D. McCarthy, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7136321) filed by Friends of the Boundary Waters Wilderness, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Center for Biological Diversity. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Brimmer, Janette)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friends of the Boundary Waters Wilderness et al v. U.S. Army Corps of Engineers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy
Represented By: Janette K Brimmer
Represented By: Jaimini Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Janette K Brimmer
Represented By: Jaimini Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of the Boundary Waters Wilderness
Represented By: Janette K Brimmer
Represented By: Jaimini Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan D. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?