Anderson v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael Anderson
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, Trans Union LLC, Experian Information Solutions, LLC, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC and Equifax Information Services LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv02494
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER on #38 Stipulation. Experian Information Solutions, LLC answer due 11/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 11/7/2019. (TJB)
November 6, 2019 Filing 39 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #38 Stipulation. (Myers, Gregory)
November 6, 2019 Filing 38 STIPULATION of Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Experian Information Solutions, LLC. Jointly Signed by Michael Anderson. (Myers, Gregory)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER on #35 Second Stipulation. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC answer due 11/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 11/6/2019. (TJB)
November 4, 2019 Filing 36 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #35 Stipulation. (Pruett, Sarah)
November 4, 2019 Filing 35 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, extension of time by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. Jointly Signed by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC and Michael Anderson. (Pruett, Sarah)
October 28, 2019 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Running, Terri) Modified text on 10/28/2019 (MKB).
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 10/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 10/16/2019. (TJB)
October 4, 2019 Filing 32 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer Complaint #30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Running, Terri)
October 4, 2019 Filing 31 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Running, Terri)
October 4, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Running, Terri)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER on #22 Stipulation. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC answer due 11/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 10/4/2019. (TJB)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER on #24 Stipulation. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC answer due 10/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 10/4/2019. (TJB)
October 4, 2019 Filing 27 Trans Union, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Brady, Scott)
October 4, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy M Sieben on behalf of Trans Union, LLC. (Sieben, Amy)
October 3, 2019 Filing 25 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #24 Stipulation. (Stephani, Michael)
October 3, 2019 Filing 24 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, For Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Defend by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. Jointly Signed by Michael Anderson. (Stephani, Michael)
October 1, 2019 Filing 23 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #22 Stipulation. (Pruett, Sarah)
October 1, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, extension of time to answer, by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. Jointly Signed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC and Michael Anderson. (Pruett, Sarah)
October 1, 2019 Filing 21 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Specialized Loan Servicing LLC (SLS) is not publicly traded and no publicly traded corporation owns 10% or more of SLSs stock. SLS is a wholly owned subsidiary of Specialized Loan Servicing Holdings LLC. Computershare Limited is the parent company of Specialized Loan Servicing LLC (Pruett, Sarah) Modified text on 10/1/2019 (MKB).
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER on #15 Stipulation. Experian Information Solutions, LLC answer due 11/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 10/1/2019. (TJB)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Emma Julia Lanzon for Experian Information Solutions, LLC. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 10/1/2019. (NAH)
September 30, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Emma Lanzon. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7178023 filed by Experian Information Solutions, LLC. (Myers, Gregory)
September 30, 2019 Filing 17 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Experian plc is a corporate parent of Defendant Experian Information Solutions, LLC. (Myers, Gregory)
September 30, 2019 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #15 Stipulation. (Myers, Gregory)
September 30, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION of Extension of Time for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Experian Information Solutions, LLC. Jointly Signed by Michael Anderson. (Myers, Gregory)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Matthew A. Morr for Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 9/25/2019. (NAH)
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew A. Morr. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7167274 filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Pruett, Sarah)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Scott Edwin Brady for Trans Union, LLC. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 9/24/2019. (NAH)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Pruett on behalf of Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Pruett, Sarah)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Scott E. Brady. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7164906 filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Fisher, Bradley)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Trans Union LLC is a wholly owned subsidiary of TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. is wholly owned by TransUnion. TransUnion is a publicly traded entity with the ticker symbol TRU. Investment funds affiliated with T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., a publicly-traded entity with the ticker symbol TROW, own more than 10 percent of TransUnions stock. (Fisher, Bradley) Modified text on 9/25/2019 (MKB).
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Anderson. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (Bauer, Blake)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Anderson. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Bauer, Blake)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Anderson. Trans Union, LLC served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Bauer, Blake)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Anderson. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Bauer, Blake)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Anderson. Experian Information Solutions, LLC served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Bauer, Blake)
September 13, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Donovan W. Frank's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these practice pointers, in addition to the District of Minnesota's Local Rules and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (las)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, LLC, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, Trans Union, LLC. (KNK)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-2494 (DWF/DTS). (KNK)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7138494) filed by Michael Anderson. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bauer, Blake)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Anderson
Represented By: Blake R Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?