Burger v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Helen Burger
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2019cv02503
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER on #9 Stipulation. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company answer or otherwise respond due date: 12/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 11/7/2019. (TMA)
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 Stipulation. (Primack, Stuart)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION For Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by Helen Burger. (Primack, Stuart)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Hartford Life, Inc. is a corporate parent of Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Hartford Holdings, Inc. is a corporate parent of Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Primack, Stuart)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart F. Primack on behalf of Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Primack, Stuart)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Stuart F. Primack for Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 11/7/2019. (NAH)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stuart F Primack. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7255883 filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Huhta, Adam)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam S Huhta on behalf of Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Huhta, Adam)
September 12, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (CLK)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-2503 WMW/ECW. (CLK)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7141655) filed by Helen Burger. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kemmitt, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burger v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Burger
Represented By: Michael John Kemmitt
Represented By: Stephen J Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?