Nelson v. The Crime Victims Reparations Act et al
Plaintiff: Darek Nelson
Defendant: The Crime Victims Reparations Act and Mat Cassell
Case Number: 0:2019cv02504
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal, #2 Appeal Packet)(MKB)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re #6 Report and Recommendation.(Written Opinion) Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 11/4/2019. (DLO)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Prisoner Complaint,, filed by Darek Nelson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 10/17/2019. (TMA)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk's Office re: Copy Request as to Darek Nelson. (KNK)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER to the Court from Darek Nelson requesting documents (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNK) Document QC'd on 10/9/2019 (MKB).
September 23, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #1 Prisoner Complaint: scanned envelope back. (KMH)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. 1.Plaintiff Darek Nelson must pay an initial partial filing fee of at least $51.22 within 20 days of the date of this order.2.Should Nelson fail to pay the initial partial filing fee, it will be recommended that this action be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/18/2019. (TMA) cc: Nelson. Modified text on 9/18/2019 (MKB).
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Darek Nelson. (JGK) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/23/2019 (KMH).
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Mat Cassell, The Crime Victims Reparations Act filed by Darek Nelson. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope) (JGK) cc: Nelson. (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2019: #3 Exhibit(s) Letter from Clerk's Office) (JGK). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2019: #4 Scanned envelope back) (KMH). Document QC'd by KMH on 9/23/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. The Crime Victims Reparations Act et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darek Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Crime Victims Reparations Act
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mat Cassell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?