Groettum v. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Amanda Groettum
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. and Capital One Financial Corporation
Case Number: 0:2019cv02505
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Steven E Rau
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 13 Amended Joint ANSWER to Complaint filed by Capital One Financial Corporation, Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. (Newman, Patrick)
October 31, 2019 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Kohls Department Stores, Inc. is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Kohls Corporation, which is a publicly held corporation. (Newman, Patrick) Modified text on 11/1/2019 (KDS).
October 31, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Capital One Financial Corporation. (Newman, Patrick)
October 31, 2019 Filing 10 Joint ANSWER to Complaint filed by Capital One Financial Corporation, Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. (Newman, Patrick)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text-Only) ORDER on #7 Stipulation. Capital One Financial Corporation answer due 10/31/2019; Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. answer due 10/31/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 10/8/2019. (MME)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 Stipulation. (Newman, Patrick)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Capital One Financial Corporation, Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Plaintiff - Amanda Groettum. (Newman, Patrick)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amanda Groettum. Capital One Financial Corporation served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Lyons, Thomas)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amanda Groettum. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Lyons, Thomas) Modified text on 9/30/2019 (KDS).
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR, WILL BE REFILED - SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amanda Groettum. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Lyons, Thomas) Modified text on 9/26/2019 (KNK).
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Capital One Financial Corporation, Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. (CLK)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 19-cv-2505 ECT/SER. (CLK)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demanded against Capital One Financial Corporation, Kohl's Department Stores Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7141929) filed by Amanda Groettum. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lyons, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Groettum v. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Groettum
Represented By: Thomas J Lyons, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?