Mendoza-Ayala et al v. Pompeo et al
Plaintiff: I. R. M., Gregorio Mendoza Ayala, Ruth Ivonne Mendoza, I.R.M. and Gregorio Mendoza-Ayala
Defendant: Mike Pompeo, John Tavenner, Kenneth Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, William Barr and Christopher Wray
Case Number: 0:2019cv02522
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Donovan W Frank
Referring Judge: Steven E Rau
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Friedrich A. P. Siekert on behalf of William Barr, Kenneth Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, Mike Pompeo, Christopher Wray. (Siekert, Friedrich)
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ruth Ivonne Mendoza, I.R.M., Gregorio Mendoza-Ayala. Kevin McAleenan served on 10/24/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(KDS) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/29/2019 (KMH).
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to William Barr, Kenneth Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, Mike Pompeo, John Tavenner, Christopher Wray. (kt)
October 18, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #8 Summons Issued in error. (MKB)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. Summons Issued as to William Barr, Kenneth Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, Mike Pompeo, John Tavenner, Christopher Wray. (MKB) Modified text on 10/18/2019 (MKB).
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER from Clerk's Office to attorneys Herbert Igbanugo and Jason Nielson enclosing USM forms re Order #6 . (MKB) Modified text on 10/21/2019 (MKB).
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/11/2019. (MME)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per 3rd/4th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 19-cv-2522 DWF/SER. (KDS)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason A. Nielson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Nielson, Jason)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason A. Nielson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Nielson, Jason)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by I. R. M., Ruth Ivonne Mendoza, Gregorio Mendoza Ayala. (Nielson, Jason)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Ruth Ivonne Mendoza, I. R. M., Gregorio Mendoza Ayala. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C1, #5 Exhibit(s) C2, #6 Exhibit(s) C3, #7 Exhibit(s) D, #8 Exhibit(s) E, #9 Exhibit(s) F, #10 Exhibit(s) G, #11 Exhibit(s) H, #12 Exhibit(s) I, #13 Exhibit(s) J, #14 Exhibit(s) K, #15 Exhibit(s) L, #16 Exhibit(s) M, #17 Exhibit(s) N, #18 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #19 Civil Cover Sheet) (Nielson, Jason) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (KDS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendoza-Ayala et al v. Pompeo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Pompeo
Represented By: Friedrich A. P. Siekert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Tavenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Represented By: Friedrich A. P. Siekert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Friedrich A. P. Siekert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: Friedrich A. P. Siekert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Wray
Represented By: Friedrich A. P. Siekert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I. R. M.
Represented By: Jason A. Nielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregorio Mendoza Ayala
Represented By: Jason A. Nielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Ivonne Mendoza
Represented By: Jason A. Nielson
Represented By: Herbert A Igbanugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.R.M.
Represented By: Jason A. Nielson
Represented By: Herbert A Igbanugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregorio Mendoza-Ayala
Represented By: Jason A. Nielson
Represented By: Herbert A Igbanugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?