Lystad v. Halverson et al
Petitioner: Neil Ray Lystad
Respondent: Kathy Halverson and Dept. of Corrections, MN
Case Number: 0:2019cv02532
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Kathy Halverson and Dept. of Corrections, MN answer due 12/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 10/28/2019. (EB)
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dept. of Corrections, MN re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , #8 Proposed Order to Judge, #7 Affidavit in Support of Motion (Stockmeyer, Edwin)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Dept. of Corrections, MN.(Stockmeyer, Edwin)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Edwin W. Stockmeyer in SUPPORT OF #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Dept. of Corrections, MN.(Stockmeyer, Edwin)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Dept. of Corrections, MN. (Stockmeyer, Edwin)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 9/30/2019. (HAM) cc: Lystad. Modified text on 10/1/2019 (MKB).
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 RECEIPT number 34641015717 in the amount of $5.00 issued to Neil Ray Lystad. (KDS) Document QC'd on 10/24/2019 (NAH).
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Dept. of Corrections, MN, Kathy Halverson Attorney Substitution. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter Attorney Substitution)(Stockmeyer, Edwin)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk's Office re: 2254 no Fee/IFP as to Neil Ray Lystad. cc: Lystad. (KDS) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (KDS).
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Neil Ray Lystad. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (Attachments: #1 FILED IN ERROR - WRONG CASE, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) cc: Lystad. (KDS) Modified text on 9/17/2019 (KDS). Modified text on 9/18/2019 (KDS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lystad v. Halverson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Neil Ray Lystad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kathy Halverson
Represented By: Edwin William Stockmeyer, III
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dept. of Corrections, MN
Represented By: Edwin William Stockmeyer, III
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?