Gronholz v. Walgreen Co.
Plaintiff: Jeff Gronholz
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Case Number: 0:2019cv02544
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 (Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. The Rule 16 Pretrial Conference scheduled for Tuesday, November 19, 2019 with Magistrate Judge Wright will be held via telephone, rather than in person. Counsel were provided conference bridge instructions via email. (TMA) Modified text on 11/14/2019 (MKB).
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Walgreen Co.. Jointly Signed by Jeff Gronholz.(Burke, Michael)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Burke on behalf of Walgreen Co.. (Burke, Michael)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER/NOTICE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/12/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2019 at 09:00 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 342 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TMA)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jeff Gronholz. (Cross, Dustan)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-2544 (PJS/ECW). (KNK)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Walgreen Co.. (Wood, Brian)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Wood, Brian)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7151842) filed by Walgreen Co.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service) (Wood, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gronholz v. Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Brian A Wood
Represented By: Michael T. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Gronholz
Represented By: Mark S Ullery
Represented By: Dustan J Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?