Charley et al v. Citizens National Bank et al
Plaintiff: Dr. Jerry Charley and Barbara Ann Charley
Defendant: Citizens National Bank and Tara Lynn Wolff
Case Number: 0:2019cv02545
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Michael J Davis
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 12:3401
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER on #17 Stipulation, see Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 11/1/2019. (JLB)
October 31, 2019 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #17 Stipulation,. (Lyons, Thomas)
October 31, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION re #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THE PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT RESPONSE ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS by Barbara Ann Charley, Jerry Charley. Jointly Signed by Citizens National Bank and Tara Lynn Wolff. (Lyons, Thomas)
October 24, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Citizens National Bank, Tara Lynn Wolff Amended Notice of Hearing (Bohnsack, Benjamin)
October 24, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (FF) before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (Bohnsack, Benjamin)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Citizens National Bank, Tara Lynn Wolff to Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 10/17/2019. (GRR)
October 15, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Citizens National Bank, Tara Lynn Wolff re #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General (Bohnsack, Benjamin)
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by All Defendants re #6 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Citizens National Bank, Tara Lynn Wolff.(Bohnsack, Benjamin)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #4 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Citizens National Bank, Tara Lynn Wolff.(Bohnsack, Benjamin)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Citizens National Bank, Tara Lynn Wolff.(Bohnsack, Benjamin)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General Declaration of Benjamin B. Bohnsack filed by Citizens National Bank, Tara Lynn Wolff.(Bohnsack, Benjamin)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Citizens National Bank, Tara Lynn Wolff.(Bohnsack, Benjamin)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Citizens National Bank, Tara Lynn Wolff.(Bohnsack, Benjamin)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Citizens National Bank, Tara Lynn Wolff.(Bohnsack, Benjamin)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Date and time to be determined. (Bohnsack, Benjamin)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Citizens National Bank, Tara Lynn Wolff. (Bohnsack, Benjamin)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Citizens National Bank, Tara Lynn Wolff. (CLK)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per Civil (6th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-2545 MJD/LIB. (CLK)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demanded against Citizens National Bank, Tara Lynn Wolff (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7152133) filed by Jerry Charley, Barbara Ann Charley. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lyons, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charley et al v. Citizens National Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Jerry Charley
Represented By: Thomas J Lyons, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Ann Charley
Represented By: Thomas J Lyons, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Lynn Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?