Reynolds v. Belts
Defendant: Tracy Belts
Petitioner: David Allen Reynolds
Respondent: Keith Ellison
Case Number: 0:2019cv02582
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 11/5/2019. (HAZ)
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED PETITION against Tracy Belts. filed by David Allen Reynolds. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (KDS) Document QC'd by KMH on 11/1/2019 (KMH).
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 10/8/2019. (HAM)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 RECEIPT number 34641015731 in the amount of $5 issued to David Reynolds. (kt) Document QC'd by KMW on 10/23/19.
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tracy Belts re #4 Notice of Appearance (Marker, Peter)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter R Marker on behalf of Tracy Belts. (Marker, Peter)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Tracy Belts Attorney Substitution. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter Attorney Substitution)(Stockmeyer, Edwin)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk's Office re: 2254 no Fee/IFP as to David Allen Reynolds. (JGK) Modified text on 9/25/2019 (JGK).
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by David Allen Reynolds. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope) (JGK) cc: Reynolds.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds v. Belts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Keith Ellison
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Allen Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Belts
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Represented By: Peter R Marker
Represented By: Edwin William Stockmeyer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?