Mehta v. Angell Energy, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Neil Mehta
Defendant: Angell Energy, LLC, Timothy Krieger, ABC Corps 1-10, Chesapeake Trading Group, LLC, Diversified Trading Company, LLC, Pegasus Energy Futures, LLC, Apollo Energy Services, LLC and John and Jane Does 1-10
Case Number: 0:2019cv02631
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 53 REPLY re #39 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Apollo Energy Services, LLC, Chesapeake Trading Group, LLC, Diversified Trading Company, LLC, Timothy Krieger, Pegasus Energy Futures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Dressen, Janel)
November 6, 2019 Filing 52 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #39 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Neil Mehta. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Minenko, Michael)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #50 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robert A Diehl for Neil Mehta. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 11/1/2019. (NAH)
October 31, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert A. Diehl. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7244731 filed by Neil Mehta. (Minenko, Michael)
October 31, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Minenko on behalf of Neil Mehta. (Minenko, Michael)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 (Text-Only) ORDER STAYING CASE. This case was recently transferred from the District of New Jersey to the District of Minnesota. Plaintiffs counsel is not licensed in the District of Minnesota so Plaintiff is seeking local counsel. All deadlines in this case are stayed until December 23, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 10/22/2019. (TJB)
October 22, 2019 Filing 47 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #39 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2020 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service on Counsel, #2 Affidavit of Service on Mehta)(Lawrence, Ryan)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER REFERRING #39 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Pegasus Energy Futures, LLC, Timothy Krieger, Chesapeake Trading Group, LLC, Diversified Trading Company, LLC, Apollo Energy Services, LLC to Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 10/17/2019. (GRR)
October 16, 2019 Filing 45 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Apollo Energy Services, LLC, Chesapeake Trading Group, LLC, Diversified Trading Company, LLC, Timothy Krieger, Pegasus Energy Futures, LLC re #41 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #40 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #42 Meet and Confer Statement, #43 Proposed Order to Judge, #39 MOTION to Dismiss/General (Lawrence, Ryan)
October 16, 2019 Filing 44 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Apollo Energy Services, LLC, Chesapeake Trading Group, LLC, Diversified Trading Company, LLC, Timothy Krieger, Pegasus Energy Futures, LLC re #39 MOTION to Dismiss/General (and all associated paperwork) (Lawrence, Ryan)
October 16, 2019 Filing 43 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #39 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Apollo Energy Services, LLC, Chesapeake Trading Group, LLC, Diversified Trading Company, LLC, Timothy Krieger, Pegasus Energy Futures, LLC.(Lawrence, Ryan)
October 16, 2019 Filing 42 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #39 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Apollo Energy Services, LLC, Chesapeake Trading Group, LLC, Diversified Trading Company, LLC, Timothy Krieger, Pegasus Energy Futures, LLC.(Lawrence, Ryan)
October 16, 2019 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM in Support re #39 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Apollo Energy Services, LLC, Chesapeake Trading Group, LLC, Diversified Trading Company, LLC, Timothy Krieger, Pegasus Energy Futures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lawrence, Ryan)
October 16, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #39 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Date and time to be determined. (Lawrence, Ryan)
October 16, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Apollo Energy Services, LLC, Chesapeake Trading Group, LLC, Diversified Trading Company, LLC, Timothy Krieger, Pegasus Energy Futures, LLC. (Lawrence, Ryan)
October 14, 2019 Filing 38 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Apollo Energy Services, LLC, Chesapeake Trading Group, LLC, Diversified Trading Company, LLC, Timothy Krieger, Pegasus Energy Futures, LLC . (Lawrence, Ryan)
October 2, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Apollo Energy Services, LLC, Chesapeake Trading Group, LLC, Diversified Trading Company, LLC, Timothy Krieger, Pegasus Energy Futures, LLC. (Lawrence, Ryan)
October 1, 2019 Filing 36 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Paul Michael Elias, Steven James Link as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (kt)cc: Paul Michael Elias, Steven James Link. (kt)
October 1, 2019 Filing 35 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 3:18-cv-02319. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis and referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz per 3rd/4th Master List.
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER that the Defendants' Motion to Transfer to the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota #6 is GRANTED; the Clerk of Court shall transfer this matter to the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota; the Clerk of Court shall close this case insofar as it exists in the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/30/2019. (jem) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/30/2019. (jem) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 32 Letter from Steven J. Link, Esq. re #29 Letter, #30 Letter. (LINK, STEVEN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 31 Letter from Steven J. Link, Esq. re #29 Letter, #30 Letter. (LINK, STEVEN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 30 Letter from Robert A. Diehl, Esq. in Response to 07/19/2019 Order re #28 Order,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A (Texas Secretary of States Certification), #2 Exhibit Exhibit B (Texas Secretary of States Ltr 7.30.19))(DIEHL, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 29 Letter from Robert A. Diehl, Esq. re #6 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court, District of Minnesota , #5 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit T Kreiger 2004 Examination, #2 Exhibit Aspirity Adversary Complaint)(DIEHL, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that by 8/01/2019, Plaintiff must e-file proof of service of the Amended Complaint on Angell Energy, LLC. If Plaintiff does not file proof of service of the Amended Complaint on Angell Energy, LLC by this deadline, the Court will dismiss without prejudice this action as to Angell Energy, LLC. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 7/17/2019. (jem) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court, District of Minnesota , #5 MOTION to Dismiss . Motions reset for 3/4/2019 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, these motions will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall reinstate Responding Defendants' #5 Motion to Dismiss and set the motion for the next Motion Day, 3/4/2019. Plaintiff's #23 Amended Complaint shall be considered the operative complaint. Responding Defendants' #5 Motion to Dismiss is deemed responsive to the #23 Amended Complaint. The Clerk of the Court shall reinstate Responding Defendants' #6 Motion to Transfer and set the motion for the next Motion Day, 3/4/2019. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 2/19/2019. (mps) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
August 31, 2018 Filing 26 BRIEF in Response to Plaintiff's Show-Cause Submission (LINK, STEVEN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 25 Certification of Neil Mehta on behalf of NEIL MEHTA Re #15 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,, #14 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,,. (Attachments: #1 Certification Supplemental Certification of N. Mehta)(DIEHL, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
August 24, 2018 Filing 24 BRIEF In Response to Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Judgment in Aspirity Bankruptcy Action)(DIEHL, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
August 24, 2018 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by NEIL MEHTA.(DIEHL, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. By 8/24/2018, Plaintiff must show cause by e-filed submission or Amended Complaint setting forth a valid basis for jurisdiction. Defendants may e-file a response by 8/31/2018. Defendants' #5 Motion to Dismiss and #6 Motion to Transfer are administratively terminated pending resolution of this Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 8/9/2018. (mps) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
August 1, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, RYAN M. LAWRENCE, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jem) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
July 31, 2018 Filing 21 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Ryan M. Lawrence to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8921345.) (LINK, STEVEN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ryan M. Lawrence, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 7/10/2018. (mps) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
June 17, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 7/16/2018 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
June 15, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by APOLLO ENERGY SERVICES, LLC, CHESAPEAKE TRADING GROUP, LLC, DIVERSIFIED TRADING COMPANY, LLC, TIMOTHY KRIEGER, PEGASUS ENERGY FUTURES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven J. Link, #2 Declaration of Ryan M. Lawrence, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(LINK, STEVEN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
June 15, 2018 Filing 18 Letter re #6 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court, District of Minnesota , #5 MOTION to Dismiss . (DIEHL, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 17 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by APOLLO ENERGY SERVICES, LLC, CHESAPEAKE TRADING GROUP, LLC, DIVERSIFIED TRADING COMPANY, LLC, TIMOTHY KRIEGER, PEGASUS ENERGY FUTURES, LLC re #6 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court, District of Minnesota (LINK, STEVEN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 16 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by APOLLO ENERGY SERVICES, LLC, CHESAPEAKE TRADING GROUP, LLC, DIVERSIFIED TRADING COMPANY, LLC, TIMOTHY KRIEGER, PEGASUS ENERGY FUTURES, LLC re #5 MOTION to Dismiss (LINK, STEVEN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
June 5, 2018 Filing 15 BRIEF in Opposition filed by NEIL MEHTA re #6 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court, District of Minnesota (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel in Opposition, #2 Exhibit A Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - May 19 2017 Press Release, #4 Exhibit C - Bankruptcy Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit D - Order Converting Bankruptcy Action, #6 Exhibit E - Bankruptcy Motion to Compel Examination, #7 Exhibit F - Bankruptcy Order Compelling 2004 Examinations, #8 Exhibit G - Twin Cities Power Form 8-K, #9 Exhibit H - April 28, 2017 Press Release, #10 Certification of Neil Mehta, #11 Exhibit A - Chesapeake Contract, #12 Exhibit B - May 2 2016 Email, #13 Exhibit C - First Amendment to Employment Contract, #14 Exhibit D - Second Amendment to Employment Contract, #15 Exhibit E - August 4 2017 email, #16 Exhibit F - July 27 2017 email, #17 Certificate of Service)(DIEHL, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 14 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #5 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel in Opposition, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - May 19 2017 Press Release, #4 Exhibit C -Bankruptcy Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit D - Order Converting Bankruptcy Action, #6 Exhibit E - Bankruptcy Motion to Compel Examination, #7 Exhibit F - Bankruptcy Order Compelling 2004 Examinations, #8 Exhibit G - Twin Cities Power Form 8-K, #9 Exhibit H - April 28, 2017 Press Release, #10 Certification of Neil Mehta, #11 Exhibit A - Chesapeake Contract, #12 Exhibit B - May 2 2016 Email, #13 Exhibit C - First Amendment to Employment Contract, #14 Exhibit D - Second Amendment to Employment Contract, #15 Exhibit E - August 4 2017 email, #16 Exhibit F - July 27 2017 email, #17 Certificate of Service)(DIEHL, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
May 3, 2018 Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court, District of Minnesota , #5 MOTION to Dismiss . Motions reset for 6/18/2018 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, these motions will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER ORDER adjourning the #5 Motion to Dismiss and the #6 Motion to Transfer Case to 6/18/2018. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 5/2/2018. (mps) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
May 1, 2018 Filing 12 Letter from Steven J. Link, Esq.. (LINK, STEVEN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LETTER ORDER adjourning the #6 Motion to Transfer to 6/4/2018. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 5/1/2018. (mps) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
April 27, 2018 Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court, District of Minnesota , #5 MOTION to Dismiss . Motions reset for 6/4/2018 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
April 27, 2018 Filing 10 Letter from Robert Diehl, Esq. re #6 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court, District of Minnesota . (DIEHL, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
April 27, 2018 Filing 9 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by NEIL MEHTA re #5 MOTION to Dismiss (DIEHL, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
April 25, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court, District of Minnesota , #5 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 5/21/2018 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
April 24, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by APOLLO ENERGY SERVICES, LLC, CHESAPEAKE TRADING GROUP, LLC, DIVERSIFIED TRADING COMPANY, LLC, PEGASUS ENERGY FUTURES, LLC. (LINK, STEVEN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
April 24, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by CHESAPEAKE TRADING GROUP, LLC.(LINK, STEVEN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
April 24, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court, District of Minnesota by APOLLO ENERGY SERVICES, LLC, CHESAPEAKE TRADING GROUP, LLC, DIVERSIFIED TRADING COMPANY, LLC, TIMOTHY KRIEGER, PEGASUS ENERGY FUTURES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(LINK, STEVEN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
April 24, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by APOLLO ENERGY SERVICES, LLC, CHESAPEAKE TRADING GROUP, LLC, DIVERSIFIED TRADING COMPANY, LLC, TIMOTHY KRIEGER, PEGASUS ENERGY FUTURES, LLC. Responses due by 5/7/2018 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Timothy Krieger, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Text of Proposed Order, #9 Certificate of Service)(LINK, STEVEN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
April 9, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by DIVERSIFIED TRADING COMPANY, LLC, CHESAPEAKE TRADING GROUP, LLC, TIMOTHY KRIEGER, PEGASUS ENERGY FUTURES, LLC, APOLLO ENERGY SERVICES, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/24/2018. (mps) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
April 9, 2018 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (LINK, STEVEN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
April 9, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN JAMES LINK on behalf of APOLLO ENERGY SERVICES, LLC, CHESAPEAKE TRADING GROUP, LLC, DIVERSIFIED TRADING COMPANY, LLC, TIMOTHY KRIEGER, PEGASUS ENERGY FUTURES, LLC (LINK, STEVEN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
February 21, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ANGELL ENERGY, LLC, APOLLO ENERGY SERVICES, LLC, CHESAPEAKE TRADING GROUP, LLC, DIVERSIFIED TRADING COMPANY, LLC, TIMOTHY KRIEGER, PEGASUS ENERGY FUTURES, LLC Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *John Moller* (jem) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
February 21, 2018 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jem) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]
February 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANGELL ENERGY, LLC, APOLLO ENERGY SERVICES, LLC, CHESAPEAKE TRADING GROUP, LLC, DIVERSIFIED TRADING COMPANY, LLC, TIMOTHY KRIEGER, PEGASUS ENERGY FUTURES, LLC, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10, ABC CORPS 1-10 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8487880) with JURY DEMAND, filed by NEIL MEHTA.(ELIAS, PAUL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mehta v. Angell Energy, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angell Energy, LLC
Represented By: Janel M Dressen
Represented By: Ryan Matthew Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Krieger
Represented By: Janel M Dressen
Represented By: Ryan Matthew Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corps 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Trading Group, LLC
Represented By: Janel M Dressen
Represented By: Ryan Matthew Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Trading Company, LLC
Represented By: Janel M Dressen
Represented By: Ryan Matthew Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pegasus Energy Futures, LLC
Represented By: Janel M Dressen
Represented By: Ryan Matthew Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apollo Energy Services, LLC
Represented By: Janel M Dressen
Represented By: Ryan Matthew Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Mehta
Represented By: Robert A Diehl
Represented By: Michael J Minenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?