Blackmon v. Howmedica Osteonics et al
Plaintiff: Bobbie Blackmon
Defendant: Stryker Ireland Limited, Stryker Sales Corporation, Stryker Corp. and Howmedica Osteonics d/b/a Stryker Orthopaedics
Case Number: 0:2019cv02652
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bobbie Blackmon. Stryker Ireland Limited served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (Nemo, Anthony)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bobbie Blackmon. Howmedica Osteonics served on 10/18/2019, answer due 11/8/2019; Stryker Corp. served on 10/18/2019, answer due 11/8/2019; Stryker Sales Corporation served on 10/18/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Davis, Frederick)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT DUE TO CASE ASSIGNMENT ERROR. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per MDL list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 19-cv-2652 DWF/BRT. (KDS) Modified text on 10/8/2019 (KDS).
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 (Text-Only) COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This docket contains pleadings and orders pertaining to this case only and some, but not all, orders from the master case file In re: Stryker Rejuvenate and ABG II Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, 0:13-md-02441-DWF-BRT. Counsel shall read and comply with all Pretrial Orders filed in this master case. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 0:13-md-2441-DWF-BRT. Additionally, access to Pretrial Orders, minutes, transcripts, and other documents issued in the master case may be found on the Stryker Rejuvenate MDL website at: #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/MDL-Stryker/index. (KDS)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Howmedica Osteonics, Stryker Corp., Stryker Ireland Limited, Stryker Sales Corporation. (KDS)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (KDS)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics, Stryker Orthopaedics, Stryker Corp., Stryker Ireland Limited, Stryker Sales Corporation (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7187681) filed by Bobbie Blackmon. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Frederick) Modified text on 10/9/2019 (KDS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackmon v. Howmedica Osteonics et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Ireland Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Sales Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics d/b/a Stryker Orthopaedics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbie Blackmon
Represented By: Frederick G Davis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?