Collins v. Beltz
Petitioner: Ricky Lee Collins, Jr
Respondent: Warden T. Beltz
Case Number: 0:2019cv02666
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: David S Doty
2 Judge: Steven E Rau
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Respondent is directed to file an answer to the petition for a writ of habeas corpus of petitioner Ricky Lee Collins, Jr. within 30 days of the date of this Order, showing cause why the writ should not be granted. If Petitioner intends to file a reply to the answer, he must do so within thirty days of the date when Respondent's answer is filed. Thereafter, no further submissions from either party will be permitted, except as expressly authorized by Court order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 11/18/2019. (JMK)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 (Text-only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the passing of Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-2666 DSD/HB. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (LJG)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 RECEIPT number 34641015752 in the amount of $5.00 issued to Ricky Collins. (MTP) Document QC'd on 10/28/2019 (NAH).
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by T. Beltz re #5 Notice of Appearance (Zettler, Todd)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd P Zettler on behalf of T. Beltz. (Zettler, Todd)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by T. Beltz Attorney Substitution. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter Attorney Substitution)(Stockmeyer, Edwin)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Ricky Lee Collins, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MTP) Document QC'd by KMH on 11/21/2019 (KMH).
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk's Office re: 2254 no Fee/IFP as to Ricky Lee Collins. (JGK)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Ricky Lee Collins, Jr. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope) (JGK) cc: Collins.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Beltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden T. Beltz
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Represented By: Todd P Zettler
Represented By: Edwin William Stockmeyer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ricky Lee Collins, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?