Berg v. Berg et al
Plaintiff: David A Berg
Defendant: Janie Warren Berg, Lighthouse Management Group, Inc., Majestic Properties & Development, LLC and Kathleen Gearin
Case Number: 0:2019cv02676
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 41 DECLARATION of David A. Berg in Opposition to #31 MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiff filed by David A Berg.(Knaak, Frederic)
December 2, 2019 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #31 MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiff filed by David A Berg. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Knaak, Frederic)
December 2, 2019 Filing 39 REPLY re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Lighthouse Management Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Sigelman, Samuel)
December 2, 2019 Filing 38 REPLY re #30 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #21 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #22 Declaration in Support,,, filed by Kathleen Gearin. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Feldhaus, Bryan)
December 2, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE by Janie Warren Berg Notice That No Reply Will Be Filed (Rodman, Scott)
November 25, 2019 Filing 36 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #31 MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiff filed by Lighthouse Management Group, Inc..(Sigelman, Samuel)
November 25, 2019 Filing 35 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #31 Motion for Sanctions filed by Lighthouse Management Group, Inc..(Sigelman, Samuel)
November 25, 2019 Filing 34 AFFIDAVIT of Samuel J. H. Sigelman in SUPPORT OF #31 MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiff filed by Lighthouse Management Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) N, O, P, Q)(Sigelman, Samuel)
November 25, 2019 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in Support re #31 MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiff filed by Lighthouse Management Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Sigelman, Samuel)
November 25, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #31 MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiff : Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Judge Eric C. Tostrud. (Sigelman, Samuel)
November 25, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiff filed by Lighthouse Management Group, Inc.. (Sigelman, Samuel)
November 21, 2019 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General , #19 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint, #13 First MOTION to Dismiss/General attorney signature added filed by David A Berg. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Only signature added)(Knaak, Frederic)
November 18, 2019 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General , #19 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint, #13 First MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by David A Berg. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Knaak, Frederic)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Amend Caption. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 11/5/2019. (KAT)
October 28, 2019 Filing 27 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Lighthouse Management Group, Inc..(Sigelman, Samuel)
October 28, 2019 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Samuel J.H. Sigelman in SUPPORT OF #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Lighthouse Management Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Exhibit(s) J, #11 Exhibit(s) K, #12 Exhibit(s) L, #13 Exhibit(s) M)(Sigelman, Samuel)
October 28, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Lighthouse Management Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Sigelman, Samuel)
October 28, 2019 Filing 24 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #19 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Kathleen Gearin.(Feldhaus, Bryan)
October 28, 2019 Filing 23 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #19 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Kathleen Gearin.(Feldhaus, Bryan)
October 28, 2019 Filing 22 Declaration of Bryan R. Feldhaus in Support of #19 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Kathleen Gearin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Order Appointing Special Master filed on July 31, 2018, #2 Exhibit(s) Special Master Order #6 filed on June 24, 2019, #3 Exhibit(s) Order and Memorandum filed July 19, 2019, #4 Exhibit(s) Order filed August 16, 2019, #5 Exhibit(s) August 30, 2019 letter from Special Master Gearin to Honorable Karen Asphaug, #6 Exhibit(s) Order to Proceed by Default filed September 6, 2019, #7 Exhibit(s) Contempt Order filed September 26, 2019, #8 Exhibit(s) Petition for Writ of Prohibition filed September 13, 2019, #9 Exhibit(s) Order denying Petition filed October 1, 2019)(Feldhaus, Bryan)
October 28, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Kathleen Gearin. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Feldhaus, Bryan)
October 28, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #19 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Judge Eric C. Tostrud. (Feldhaus, Bryan)
October 28, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Kathleen Gearin. (Feldhaus, Bryan)
October 28, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #13 First MOTION to Dismiss/General : Date and time to be determined. (Rodman, Scott)
October 28, 2019 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #13 First MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Janie Warren Berg.(Rodman, Scott)
October 28, 2019 Filing 16 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #13 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Janie Warren Berg.(Rodman, Scott)
October 28, 2019 Filing 15 EXHIBIT re #13 First MOTION to Dismiss/General , #14 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Janie Warren Berg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s))(Rodman, Scott)
October 28, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 First MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Janie Warren Berg.(Rodman, Scott)
October 28, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Janie Warren Berg. (Rodman, Scott)
October 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott M Rodman on behalf of Janie Warren Berg. (Rodman, Scott)
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan R Feldhaus on behalf of Kathleen Gearin. (Feldhaus, Bryan)
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #1 Complaint filed by David A Berg.(Knaak, Frederic)
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #1 Complaint filed by David A Berg. (Knaak, Frederic)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Craig J. Beuning as counsel of record for David A Berg. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MTP)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Judge Eric C. Tostrud. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sigelman, Samuel)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #5 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Lighthouse Management Group, Inc..(Sigelman, Samuel)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Lighthouse Management Group, Inc.. (Sigelman, Samuel)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Janie Warren Berg, Kathleen Gearin, Lighthouse Management Group, Inc., Majestic Properties & Development, LLC. (MTP)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY FILED IN ERROR. MISSING DOCUMENT: Summons Issued as to Janie Warren Berg, Kathleen Gearin, Lighthouse Management Group, Inc., Majestic Properties & Development, LLC. (MTP) Modified text on 10/8/2019 (MTP).
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Master List, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 19cv2676 ECT/KMM. (MTP)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7196544) filed by David A Berg. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Knaak, Frederic)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berg v. Berg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A Berg
Represented By: Frederic W Knaak
Represented By: Wayne B Holstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janie Warren Berg
Represented By: Kendal K O'Keefe
Represented By: Scott M Rodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lighthouse Management Group, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel J H Sigelman
Represented By: Amanda Sicoli Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Majestic Properties & Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Gearin
Represented By: Bryan R Feldhaus
Represented By: Michelle Kristine Kuhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?