Louis DeGidio, Inc. et al v. Industrial Combustion, LLC
Plaintiff: Louis DeGidio Services, Inc., Louis DeGidio, Inc., James DeGidio and Michael DeGidio
Defendant: Industrial Combustion, LLC. and Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv02690
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John R Tunheim
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Summons Issued as to Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Industrial Combustion, LLC. (MMP)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE - Summons Issued as to Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., a Delaware corporation and Industrial Combustion, LLC., A Wisconsin limited liability company. (MMP) Modified text on 12/5/2019 (MMP).
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION - DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REISSUE for 41 Summons Issued (MMP)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Industrial Combustion, LLC., Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.. filed by Louis DeGidio, Inc., Michael DeGidio, James DeGidio, Louis DeGidio Services, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Walsten, Trevor)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim: Motion Hearing held on 11/20/2019 re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by James DeGidio, Michael DeGidio, Louis DeGidio Services, Inc., Louis DeGidio, Inc. Motion taken under advisement. Written order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Kristine Mousseau) (HAZ)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim: Motion Hearing held on 11/20/2019 re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by James DeGidio, Michael DeGidio, Louis DeGidio Services, Inc., Louis DeGidio, Inc. Motion taken under advisement. Written order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Kristine Mousseau) (HAZ) Modified text on 11/22/2019 (MMP). Modified text on 11/22/2019 (MMP).
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER/NOTICE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/30/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2020 at 09:00 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 342 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 11/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TMA)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by James DeGidio, Michael DeGidio, Louis DeGidio Services, Inc., Louis DeGidio, Inc. . (Walsten, Trevor)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by All Plaintiffs re #33 Response in Support of Motion filed by James DeGidio, Michael DeGidio, Louis DeGidio Services, Inc., Louis DeGidio, Inc..(Walsten, Trevor)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Supplemental AFFIDAVIT of James DeGidio in SUPPORT OF #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by James DeGidio, Michael DeGidio, Louis DeGidio Services, Inc., Louis DeGidio, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit J [REDACTED])(Walsten, Trevor)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 RESPONSE in Support re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by James DeGidio, Michael DeGidio, Louis DeGidio Services, Inc., Louis DeGidio, Inc..(Walsten, Trevor)
November 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Industrial Combustion, LLC.. (Maher, Ann)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER on #29 Stipulation,. Industrial Combustion, LLC. answer due 11/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 11/6/2019. (TMA)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #29 Stipulation. (Maher, Ann)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, for Extension of Time with attached Certificate of Service by Industrial Combustion, LLC.. Jointly Signed by Louis Degidio. Inc., Louis Degidio, Inc., Services, Inc., James Degidio, and Michael Degidio. (Maher, Ann) Modified text on 11/5/2019 (MMP).
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim: Telephone Status Conference held on 11/4/2019. (Court Reporter Kristine Mousseau) (HAZ)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 DECLARATION of Kevin Pheney in Opposition to #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Industrial Combustion, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E)(Maher, Ann)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 DECLARATION of Mike Teasdale in Opposition to #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Industrial Combustion, LLC..(Maher, Ann)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 DECLARATION of Katrina Jackson in Opposition to #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Industrial Combustion, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Maher, Ann)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Industrial Combustion, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Maher, Ann)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 (Text-Only) NOTICE: Telephone Status Conference set for 11/4/2019 at 10:30 AM in Judge's Chambers 15 (MPLS) before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim. (HAZ)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE by Industrial Combustion, LLC. re #21 Letter to District Judge . (McGarry, Daniel)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by James DeGidio, Michael DeGidio, Louis DeGidio Services, Inc., Louis DeGidio, Inc. . (Walsten, Trevor)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Industrial Combustion, LLC.. (Maher, Ann)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 3-Day Transcript of #18 Status Conference,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, to Court Reporter Kristine Mousseau. (Walsten, Trevor)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/21/2019, Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested : Responses due by 11/1/2019, Replies due by 11/15/2019, Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 15 (MPLS) before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim. (Court Reporter Kristine Mousseau) (HAZ)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J McGarry on behalf of Industrial Combustion, LLC.. (McGarry, Daniel)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Permission for Non-Resident Attorney to Serve as Local Counsel and Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ann Maher for Industrial Combustion, LLC. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 10/21/2019. (NAH)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann Maher on behalf of Industrial Combustion, LLC.. (Maher, Ann)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (Text-Only) NOTICE: Telephone Status Conference set for 10/21/2019 at 11:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 15 (MPLS) before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim. (HAZ)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ann M. Maher. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7212890 filed by Industrial Combustion, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel)(McGarry, Daniel)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Louis DeGidio, Inc., Michael DeGidio, James DeGidio, Louis DeGidio Services, Inc.. Industrial Combustion, LLC. served on 10/14/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Walsten, Trevor)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE - Summons Returned Unexecuted by Louis DeGidio, Inc., Michael DeGidio, James DeGidio, Louis DeGidio Services, Inc. as to Industrial Combustion, LLC. (Walsten, Trevor) Modified text on 10/17/2019 (MMP).
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by James DeGidio, Michael DeGidio, Louis DeGidio Services, Inc., Louis DeGidio, Inc..(Walsten, Trevor)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of David Brandis in SUPPORT OF #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by James DeGidio, Michael DeGidio, Louis DeGidio Services, Inc., Louis DeGidio, Inc..(Walsten, Trevor)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of James DeGidio in SUPPORT OF #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by James DeGidio, Michael DeGidio, Louis DeGidio Services, Inc., Louis DeGidio, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F (Redacted), #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H (Redacted))(Walsten, Trevor)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by James DeGidio, Michael DeGidio, Louis DeGidio Services, Inc., Louis DeGidio, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Walsten, Trevor)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by James DeGidio, Michael DeGidio, Louis DeGidio Services, Inc., Louis DeGidio, Inc.. (Walsten, Trevor)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Industrial Combustion, LLC. (MKB)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-2690 (JRT/ECW). (MKB) Modified text on 10/11/2019 (MKB).
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiffs James DeGidio, Michael DeGidio, Louis DeGidio Services, Inc., Louis DeGidio, Inc.. (Walsten, Trevor)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor R Walsten on behalf of James DeGidio, Michael DeGidio, Louis DeGidio Services, Inc., Louis DeGidio, Inc.. (Walsten, Trevor)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Industrial Combustion, LLC. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7202737) filed by Louis DeGidio, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Walsten, Trevor) Modified text on 10/11/2019 (MKB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louis DeGidio, Inc. et al v. Industrial Combustion, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis DeGidio Services, Inc.
Represented By: Trevor R Walsten
Represented By: David A Brandis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis DeGidio, Inc.
Represented By: David A Brandis
Represented By: Trevor R Walsten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James DeGidio
Represented By: Trevor R Walsten
Represented By: David A Brandis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael DeGidio
Represented By: Trevor R Walsten
Represented By: David A Brandis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Combustion, LLC.
Represented By: Ann Maher
Represented By: Daniel J McGarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?