Sunberg v. Central Research, Inc.
Plaintiff: Victoria Sunberg
Defendant: Central Research, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv02695
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/27/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 1/3/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JMK)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 7.1: A nongovernmental corporate party must file 2 copies of a disclosure statement that: identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock; or states that there is no such corporation. In Compliance with the above provision, this Corporate Disclosure Statement is filed on behalf of Central Research, Inc., and Central Research, Inc. is not a parent, subsidiary or other affiliate of a publicly owned corporations. There is a publicly owned corporation, not a party to the case, that has a financial interest in the outcome. Central Research, Inc.s insurer is ultimately owned by W.R. Berkley Corporation, which is publicly traded on the N.Y. Stock Exchange under the symbol WRB. (Patrick, John) Modified text on 11/14/2019 (MMP).
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Central Research, Inc.. (Patrick, John)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Victoria Sunberg. Central Research, Inc. served on 10/16/2019, answer due 11/6/2019. (Bauer, Blake)
October 15, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Central Research, Inc. (lmb)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-2695 (SRN/HB). (lmb)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Central Research, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7204041) filed by Victoria Sunberg. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Verification of Complaint) (Bauer, Blake)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sunberg v. Central Research, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Sunberg
Represented By: Blake R Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Research, Inc.
Represented By: John Benjamin Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?