Struthers v. St. Cloud VA Health Care System
Plaintiff: Jerry Struthers
Defendant: St. Cloud VA Health Care System
Case Number: 0:2019cv02697
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE to Jerry Struther re: referral to FBA Pro Se Project. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 12/9/2019. (JLB)
December 6, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by St. Cloud VA Health Care System re #12 Proposed Order to Judge - Other, #11 Meet and Confer Statement, #10 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General , #9 Notice of Hearing on Motion (Tweeten, Andrew)
December 6, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Motion to Dismiss #8 Motion to Dismiss/General. (Tweeten, Andrew)
December 6, 2019 Filing 11 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #8 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by St. Cloud VA Health Care System.(Tweeten, Andrew)
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by St. Cloud VA Health Care System. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Tweeten, Andrew)
December 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3 (DUL) before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (Tweeten, Andrew)
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by St. Cloud VA Health Care System. (Tweeten, Andrew)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING ALL DISPOSITIVE AND NON-DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS to Magistrate Judge Brisbois. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 12/5/2019. (KMW)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER on #3 Request. St. Cloud VA Health Care System answer due 12/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 10/18/2019. (JLB) Modified text on 12/3/2019 (JLB).
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by St. Cloud VA Health Care System re #4 Proposed Order to Judge - Other, #3 Request (Tweeten, Andrew)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #3 Request. (Tweeten, Andrew)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond by St. Cloud VA Health Care System. (Tweeten, Andrew)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (5th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-2697 (NEB/LIB). (lmb)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pine County District Court, Tenth Judicial District, case number 58-CO-19-159 filed by St. Cloud VA Health Care System. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 & 2 - Summons & Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 State Court Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Certificate of Service) (Tweeten, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Struthers v. St. Cloud VA Health Care System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Struthers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Cloud VA Health Care System
Represented By: Andrew Tweeten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?