Phillips et al v. Caliber Home Loans
Plaintiff: Mary Tourville-Phillips and Stephen Phillips
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc. and Caliber Home Loans
Case Number: 0:2019cv02711
Filed: October 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. re #31 Proposed Order to Judge - Other, #29 Meet and Confer Statement, #27 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action Complaint, #28 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #30 Notice of Hearing on Motion, (Knapp, Christopher)
December 11, 2019 Filing 31 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #27 Motion to Dismiss/General. (Knapp, Christopher)
December 11, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #27 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Knapp, Christopher)
December 11, 2019 Filing 29 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #27 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc..(Knapp, Christopher)
December 11, 2019 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Support re #27 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Knapp, Christopher)
December 11, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Knapp, Christopher)
November 27, 2019 Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Caliber Home Loans. filed by Stephen Phillips, Mary Tourville-Phillips. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2) (Lowther, Edwin)
November 15, 2019 Filing 25 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #19 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Knapp, Christopher)
November 6, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Caliber Home Loans re #22 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #20 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #21 Meet and Confer Statement, #19 MOTION to Dismiss/General , #23 Proposed Order to Judge (Knapp, Christopher)
November 6, 2019 Filing 23 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #19 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Caliber Home Loans.(Knapp, Christopher)
November 6, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #19 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 1/15/2020 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Knapp, Christopher)
November 6, 2019 Filing 21 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #19 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Caliber Home Loans.(Knapp, Christopher)
November 6, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Caliber Home Loans. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Knapp, Christopher)
November 6, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Caliber Home Loans. (Knapp, Christopher)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Thomas N. Abbott for Caliber Home Loans. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 10/31/2019. (NAH)
October 31, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas N. Abbott. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7244617 filed by Caliber Home Loans. (Knapp, Christopher)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Edwin Lee Lowther, III for Stephen Phillips and for Mary Tourville-Phillips; granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Randy Pulliam for Stephen Phillips and for Mary Tourville-Phillips; granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Hank Bates for Stephen Phillips and for Mary Tourville-Phillips. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 10/29/2019. (NAH)
October 28, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph Henry "Hank" Bates, III. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7235307 filed by Stephen Phillips, Mary Tourville-Phillips. (Goodwin, David)
October 28, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Randall K. Pulliam. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7235279 filed by Stephen Phillips, Mary Tourville-Phillips. (Goodwin, David)
October 28, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Edwin "Lee" Lowther. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7235243 filed by Stephen Phillips, Mary Tourville-Phillips. (Goodwin, David)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kristine E. Kruger for Caliber Home Loans; granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robert Christopher Folland, I for Caliber Home Loans. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 10/23/2019. (NAH)
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert C. Folland. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7219879 filed by Caliber Home Loans. (Knapp, Christopher)
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kristine Kruger. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7219845 filed by Caliber Home Loans. (Knapp, Christopher)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on #7 Stipulation. Caliber Home Loans answer due 11/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 10/18/2019. (JLB)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 Stipulation. (Knapp, Christopher)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Caliber Home Loans. Jointly Signed by Stephen Phillips and Mary Tourville-Phillips. (Knapp, Christopher)
October 15, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Randall K. Pulliam, Hank Bates, E. Lee Lowther III as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MKB)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (5th - Civil Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-2711 (WMW/LIB). (MKB)
October 14, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. re #3 Declaration, #1 Notice of Removal,, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Knapp, Christopher)
October 14, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Justin Nezda re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. . (Knapp, Christopher)
October 14, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. LSF6 Service Operations, LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Knapp, Christopher)
October 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lake County, case number 38-cv-19-412 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7206407) filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) State Court Complaint with exhibit, #2 Exhibit(s) State Court Summons, #3 Exhibit(s) State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit(s) State Court case docket, #5 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal Notice of Notice of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Knapp, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips et al v. Caliber Home Loans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Tourville-Phillips
Represented By: Edwin Lee Lowther, III
Represented By: David A Goodwin
Represented By: Hank Bates
Represented By: Mickey L Stevens
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Represented By: Randy Pulliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Phillips
Represented By: Edwin Lee Lowther, III
Represented By: David A Goodwin
Represented By: Hank Bates
Represented By: Mickey L Stevens
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Represented By: Randy Pulliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J Knapp
Represented By: Thomas N. Abbott
Represented By: Kristine E. Kruger
Represented By: Robert Christopher Folland, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans
Represented By: Christopher J Knapp
Represented By: Thomas N. Abbott
Represented By: Kristine E. Kruger
Represented By: Robert Christopher Folland, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?