Bruess v. Dietz
Appellant: Sandra Jo Bruess
Appellee: Michael S. Dietz
Case Number: 0:2019cv02714
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF RECEIPT AND ASSIGNMENT IN RE: BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL. (MKB)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(1), the Clerk of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Minnesota gives notice that the record for this appeal is available electronically.(KKN)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M O'Brien on behalf of Sandra Jo Bruess. (O'Brien, Kevin)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF ISSUES by Appellant Sandra Jo Bruess.(KKN)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE OF RECEIPT AND ASSIGNMENT IN RE: BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL. (lmb)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list. Please use case number 19-cv-2714 (JRT). (lmb)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of APPEAL from United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Minnesota. Bankruptcy Court case number 14-34922. Adversary Proceeding number 18-3097, filed by Sandra Jo Bruess. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Notice on Appeal, #2 Election to U.S. District Court, #3 Identification of Residence, #4 Order on Appeal, #5 Judgment, #6 Adversary Docket, #7 Bankruptcy Docket) (SMD) Modified text on 10/15/2019 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruess v. Dietz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sandra Jo Bruess
Represented By: Kevin M O'Brien
Represented By: Keith D Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Michael S. Dietz
Represented By: Michael S Dietz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?