Gisairo v. Lenovo (United States) Inc.
Plaintiff: Martin Gisairo
Defendant: Lenovo (United States) Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv02727
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Christina N. Goodrich as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (lmb)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel J. Stephenson for Lenovo (United States) Inc. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 12/12/2019. (NAH)
December 11, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel J. Stephenson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7330269 filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Klobucar, Jeffrey) Modified text on 12/12/2019 (NAH).
December 10, 2019 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Defendant Lenovo (United States) Inc. is a wholly owned subsidiary of Lenovo Holding Company, Inc. (Klobucar, Jeffrey) Modified text on 12/13/2019 (lmb).
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Nicholas Migliaccio for Martin Gisairo. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 12/5/2019. (NAH)
December 3, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nicholas A. Migliaccio. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7313912 filed by Martin Gisairo. (Goodwin, David)
November 21, 2019 Filing 13 FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christina N. Goodrich. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7291385 filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Klobucar, Jeffrey) Modified text on 12/6/2019 (NAH).
November 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark R Bradford on behalf of Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Bradford, Mark)
November 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey D. Klobucar on behalf of Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Klobucar, Jeffrey)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER on #8 Stipulation. Lenovo (United States) Inc. answer due 1/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 11/20/2019. (JLB)
November 19, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 Stipulation. (Klobucar, Jeffrey)
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Lenovo (United States) Inc.. Jointly Signed by Plaintiff. (Klobucar, Jeffrey)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jason S. Rathod for Martin Gisairo. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 11/8/2019. (NAH)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jason S. Rathod. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7260729 filed by Martin Gisairo. (Goodwin, David)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martin Gisairo. Lenovo (United States) Inc. served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. (Goodwin, David)
October 18, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Nicholas A. Migliaccio, Jason S. Rathod, Esfand Nafisi, Kevin Landau, Evan Rosin as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (kt)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (kt)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-2727 WMW/LIB. (kt)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lenovo (United States) Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7214257) filed by Martin Gisairo. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Goodwin, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gisairo v. Lenovo (United States) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Gisairo
Represented By: David A Goodwin
Represented By: Daniel C Hedlund
Represented By: Jason S. Rathod
Represented By: Nicholas Migliaccio
Represented By: Mickey L Stevens
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenovo (United States) Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Stephenson
Represented By: Mark R Bradford
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Klobucar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?