Hughes v. Canadian National Railway Company et al
Plaintiff: Ricky Hughes
Defendant: Wisconsin Central Ltd and Canadian National Railway Company
Case Number: 0:2019cv02733
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Donovan W Frank
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ricky Hughes. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service Deft CN, #2 Affidavit of Service Deft Wis Central)(Ingebritson, Russell)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael B Gunzburg for Ricky Hughes. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 11/19/2019. (NAH)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael Gunzburg. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number BMNDC-7276100 filed by Ricky Hughes. (Ingebritson, Russell)
October 21, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Donovan W. Frank's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these practice pointers, in addition to the District of Minnesota's Local Rules and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (las)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Michael B. Gunzburg as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (CLK)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Canadian National Railway Company, Wisconsin Central Ltd. (CLK)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil (5th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-2733 DWF/LIB. (CLK)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Canadian National Railway Company and Wisconsin Central Ltd. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7214763) filed by Ricky Hughes. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ingebritson, Russell) Modified text on 10/18/2019 (CLK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes v. Canadian National Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Central Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canadian National Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Hughes
Represented By: Russell A Ingebritson
Represented By: Michael B Gunzburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?