Jacques v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Brandon Jacques
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 0:2019cv02737
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Thomas A.P. Hayden for Union Pacific Railroad Company; granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brody Elizabeth Dawson for Union Pacific Railroad Company. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 12/6/2019. (NAH)
December 6, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brody Elizabeth Dawson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7321353 filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Gendreau, Dan)
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas A.P. Hayden. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7321125 filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Gendreau, Dan)
November 11, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Union Pacific Railroad Company is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Gendreau, Dan)
November 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Dan J Gendreau on behalf of Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gendreau, Dan) Modified text on 11/12/2019 (kt).
November 11, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Gendreau, Dan)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brandon Jacques. Union Pacific Railroad Company served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (LeNeave, Randal)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Union Pacific Railroad Company. (MTP)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-2737 JRT/LIB. (MTP)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Union Pacific Railroad Company (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7216896) filed by Brandon Jacques. Filer requests summons issued. (ATTACHMENT #1 FILED IN ERROR: Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (LeNeave, Randal) Modified text on 10/18/2019 (MTP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacques v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Thomas A.P. Hayden
Represented By: Dan J Gendreau
Represented By: Brody Elizabeth Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Jacques
Represented By: Randal W LeNeave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?