Martin v. Vargas
Plaintiff: Dane M Martin
Defendant: Hilario Vargas and Hilario O Vargas
Case Number: 0:2019cv02756
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 13 (Text-Only) AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : The Motion Hearing is scheduled for 1/15/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3A (St. Paul Federal Courthouse) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (KMW)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Within 30 days of the motion being decided, Plaintiff shall contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Tony Leung, by letter or e-mail, for the purpose of scheduling the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 11/13/2019. (HAM)
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hilario O Vargas re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #10 Proposed Order to Judge, #6 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #8 Declaration in Support, #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #9 Meet and Confer Statement (Mastellar, Alexander)
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Hilario O Vargas.(Mastellar, Alexander)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #5 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Hilario O Vargas.(Mastellar, Alexander)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 Declaration of Alex T. Mastellar in Support of #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Hilario O Vargas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A. Arbitration Agreement, #2 Exhibit(s) B. NCDS Arbitration Rule)(Mastellar, Alexander)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Hilario O Vargas. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Mastellar, Alexander)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for 1/15/2020 at 10:00 AM in US Courthouse (CVB) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (Mastellar, Alexander)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Hilario O Vargas. (Mastellar, Alexander)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dane M Martin. Hilario O Vargas served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. (Martin, Dane)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 Clerk's Notice of APPLICATION FOR PRO SE LITIGANT TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY. Dane M Martin is GRANTED e-filing privileges in this case. Pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 5 and 7(d), Dane M Martin has consented to electronic service and has agreed to waive service by other means for all subsequent filings in this case, except when electronic service is not allowed under the rules. (NAH)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued conventionally as to Hilario Vargas. (JGK) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/23/2019 (KMH).
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hilario Vargas (filing fee $400, receipt number 4-105094) filed by Dean Martin. Filer requests summons issued. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JGK) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/23/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dane M Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilario Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilario O Vargas
Represented By: Alexander T Mastellar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?