Country Inn & Suites by Radisson, Inc. v. Burns Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Country Inn & Suites by Radisson, Inc.
Defendant: Burns Management, LLC, Dale E. Daggett and CM Burns, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv02757
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Pretrial Conference set for Thursday, January 16, 2020 at 11:50 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 734 (STP) before The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson. (LLM)
December 5, 2019 Filing 16 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Country Inn & Suites by Radisson, Inc.. filed by Dale E. Daggett, CM Burns, LLC, Burns Management, LLC. (Haff, Jeffery)
December 4, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney FOR DEFENDANTS (Miamen, Kristy)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER on #12 Stipulation as to All Defendants.Answer due 12/6/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 11/27/2019. (TJB)
November 26, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #12 Stipulation. (Haff, Jeffery)
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by Burns Management, LLC, CM Burns, LLC, Dale E. Daggett. Jointly Signed by Country Inn & Suites By Radisson, Inc.. (Haff, Jeffery)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffery S Haff on behalf of Burns Management, LLC, CM Burns, LLC, Dale E. Daggett. (Haff, Jeffery)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristy Lynn Miamen on behalf of Burns Management, LLC, CM Burns, LLC, Dale E. Daggett. (Miamen, Kristy)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED ORDER: In re dispositive motion practice in cases assigned to Judge Magnuson, signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on October 1, 2014. (JEP)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Country Inn & Suites by Radisson, Inc.. Dale E. Daggett served on 10/27/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Miller, Craig)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Country Inn & Suites by Radisson, Inc.. CM Burns, LLC served on 10/27/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Miller, Craig)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Country Inn & Suites by Radisson, Inc.. Burns Management, LLC served on 10/27/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Miller, Craig)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-2757 PAM/DTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/24/2019. (CLK)
October 23, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Burns Management, LLC, CM Burns, LLC, Dale E. Daggett. (CLK)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-2757 PAM/HB. (CLK)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Jinjiang International Holdings Co., Ltd. is a corporate parent of Plaintiff Country Inn & Suites by Radisson, Inc.. (Miller, Craig)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7222827) filed by Country Inn & Suites by Radisson, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex. A - License Agreement, #2 Exhibit(s) Ex. B - Corporate Guaranty, #3 Exhibit(s) Ex. C. - Personal Guaranty, #4 Exhibit(s) Ex. D - Termination Notice, #5 Exhibit(s) Ex. E. - 3-27-19 Demand Letter, #6 Exhibit(s) Ex. F - 7-1-19 Demand Letter, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Miller, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Country Inn & Suites by Radisson, Inc. v. Burns Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burns Management, LLC
Represented By: Kristy Lynn Miamen
Represented By: Jeffery S Haff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale E. Daggett
Represented By: Kristy Lynn Miamen
Represented By: Jeffery S Haff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CM Burns, LLC
Represented By: Kristy Lynn Miamen
Represented By: Jeffery S Haff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Country Inn & Suites by Radisson, Inc.
Represented By: Craig P Miller
Represented By: Raymond J Konz
Represented By: Kirk W Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?