Nordby v. Sherburne County
Plaintiff: Jillian Nordby
Defendant: Sherburne County
Case Number: 0:2019cv02776
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Donovan W Frank
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/30/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 2/6/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 12/19/2019. (JMK) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/19/2019: #1 Consent Form) (CLK).
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Sherburne County. (Ebert, Dyan)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Dyan Ebert Acknowledgement filed by Jillian Nordby. (Villaume, Philip)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Sherburne County. (Ebert, Dyan)
October 31, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Donovan W. Frank's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these practice pointers, in addition to the District of Minnesota's Local Rules and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (las)
October 28, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sherburne County. (MTP)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-2776 DWF/HB. (MTP)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sherburne County (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7229978) filed by Jillian Nordby. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Villaume, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nordby v. Sherburne County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jillian Nordby
Represented By: Philip G. Villaume
Represented By: Jeffrey D Schiek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherburne County
Represented By: Dyan J Ebert
Represented By: Cally R Kjellberg-Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?