Camp v. City of Dayton et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Campbell and Matthew Camp
Defendant: City of Dayton, Officer Brant Standridge and Police Chief Paul Enga
Case Number: 0:2019cv02806
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/1/2020; Fact Discovery due by 7/1/2020; Non-Dispositive Motions due by 8/1/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 9/1/2020; Ready For Trial by 11/1/2020. Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 12/20/2019. (LLM)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 **TEXT ONLY ENTRY** The Rule 16 Pretrial Conference set for Friday, December 20, 2019 at 10 a.m. #6 is CANCELLED. (LLM)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by City of Dayton, Paul Enga, Brant Standridge. Jointly Signed by Matthew Camp.(Hiveley, Jason)
November 25, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #6 Notice of Hearing. NEF regenerated to include Consent Form attachment. (CLK)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RULE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Pretrial Conference set for December 20, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in Judges Chambers, Suite 734 (STP) before Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (JEP) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/25/2019: #1 Consent Form) (CLK).
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 (Text-only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the passing of Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. NOTE: the new case number is 0:19-cv-02806-PAM-KMM. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (JAT)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED ORDER: In re dispositive motion practice in cases assigned to Judge Magnuson, signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on October 1, 2014.(JEP)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 19-cv-2806 PAM/SER. (MTP)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint filed by City of Dayton, Police Chief Paul Enga, Officer Brant Standridge. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Hiveley, Jason)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court, case number 27-cv-19-17948 (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-7237946) filed by Officer Brant Standridge, Police Chief Paul Enga, City of Dayton. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal acceptance, #4 Civil Cover Sheet). (Hiveley, Jason) Modified text on 11/20/2019 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camp v. City of Dayton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Camp
Represented By: Zorislav R Leyderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Dayton
Represented By: Jason M Hiveley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Brant Standridge
Represented By: Jason M Hiveley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Chief Paul Enga
Represented By: Jason M Hiveley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?