Granite Re, Inc. v. Northern Lines Contracting, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Granite Re, Inc.
Defendant: BR Holdings, Inc., Northland Dedicated, LLC, Northern Lines Contracting, Inc., Blair J. Raitz and Faribault County
Case Number: 0:2019cv02832
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of David R. Hackworthy re 6 Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney,,, byGranite Re, Inc.. (Hackworthy, David)
November 11, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Granite Re, Inc. Northland Dedicated, LLC waiver sent on 11/6/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (Gregerson, David) Modified text on 11/14/2019 (CLK).
November 11, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Granite Re, Inc.. Northern Lines Contracting, Inc. waiver sent on 11/6/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (Gregerson, David) Modified text on 11/14/2019 (CLK).
November 11, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Granite Re, Inc.. BR Holdings, Inc. waiver sent on 11/6/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (Gregerson, David) Modified text on 11/14/2019 (CLK).
November 11, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Granite Re, Inc.. Blair J. Raitz waiver sent on 11/6/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (Gregerson, David) Modified text on 11/13/2019 (CLK).
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Granite Re, Inc. Faribault County waiver sent on 11/6/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (Gregerson, David) Modified text on 11/8/2019 (CLK). Modified text on 11/13/2019 (CLK).
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing David R. Hackworthy as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (KDS)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to BR Holdings, Inc., Faribault County, Northern Lines Contracting, Inc., Northland Dedicated, LLC, Blair J. Raitz. (KDS)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd/4th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-2832 PJS/ECW. (KDS)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint,. (Gregerson, David) Modified text on 11/6/2019 (MKB).
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Federated Mutual Insurance Company is a corporate parent of Defendant Granite Re, Inc.. (Gregerson, David)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BR Holdings, Inc., Faribault County, Minnesota, Northern Lines Contracting, Inc., Northland Dedicated, LLC, Blair Raitz (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7250722) filed by Granite Re, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Gregerson, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Granite Re, Inc. v. Northern Lines Contracting, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BR Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northland Dedicated, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Lines Contracting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blair J. Raitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faribault County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Granite Re, Inc.
Represented By: David H Gregerson
Represented By: Daniel R Gregerson
Represented By: David R. Hackworthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?