Bukuru v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Elias Bukuru
Respondent: Secretary Department of Homeland Security, Ronald Vitiello, William P. Barr, Peter Berg and Kurt Freitag
Case Number: 0:2019cv02838
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William P. Barr, Peter Berg, Secretary Department of Homeland Security, Ronald Vitiello re #6 Declaration, #5 Response (Fuller, David)
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Kalob Kresser re #5 Response by William P. Barr, Peter Berg, Secretary Department of Homeland Security, Ronald Vitiello . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fuller, David)
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by William P. Barr, Peter Berg, Secretary Department of Homeland Security, Ronald Vitiello.(Fuller, David)
November 25, 2019 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: Order, Doc. No. #4 . Mail not re-sent to Elias Bukuru..(MMP) Modified and Qc'd on 12/17/2019 (KNK).
November 13, 2019 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail Returned to Sender. Attempted - Not Known. Unable to Forward. Mail not resent to Elias Bukuru. (MMP)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Defendant(s)/Respondent(s) to file answer within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 11/7/2019. (TMA)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David W Fuller on behalf of William P. Barr, Peter Berg, Secretary Department of Homeland Security, Ronald Vitiello. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fuller, David)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Elias Bukuru. (MMP) Document QC'd by KMH on 12/2/2019 (KMH).
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Elias Bukuru. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd 4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope) (MMP) Document QC'd by KMH on 12/2/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bukuru v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: David W Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald Vitiello
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: David W Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: David W Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Peter Berg
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: David W Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kurt Freitag
Represented By: David John Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Elias Bukuru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?